Global Patent Index - EP 1000240 A1

EP 1000240 A1 2000-05-17 - FUEL INJECTION VALVE FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES

Title (en)

FUEL INJECTION VALVE FOR INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINES

Title (de)

KRAFTSTOFFEINSPRITZVENTIL FÜR BRENNKRAFTMASCHINEN

Title (fr)

SOUPAPE D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT POUR MOTEURS A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 1000240 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99936348 A

Priority

  • DE 9901578 W
  • DE 19823935 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9961779A1] An actuator (100) is actively connected to a closing member (370) by means of a tappet (200), whereby the closing member (370) is located in a valve chamber (345). Said member and a valve seat (350) extending conically as part of a servo valve (340) form a seal resistant to high pressures. The cross section of the closing member (370) has a mushroom-shaped embodiment, whereby the closing head has a semispherical shape and a central flattened area enabling the tappet (200) to have an enlarged bearing area. The butt of the closing member is surrounded by a valve spring (390). The closing member (370) is preferably formed from a solid sphere.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 47/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 47/00 (2006.01); F02M 47/02 (2006.01); F02M 51/00 (2006.01); F02M 59/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 63/0036 (2013.01); F02M 47/027 (2013.01); F02M 59/46 (2013.01); F02M 63/0026 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9961779A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9961779 A1 19991202; EP 1000240 A1 20000517; EP 1000240 B1 20040324; JP 2002516952 A 20020611; US 6250563 B1 20010626

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160520

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160531

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150528

2016-01-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20150528

2015-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150514

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140521

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-09-21 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20110825 AND 20110831

2011-06-17 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2005-03-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041228

2004-11-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-04-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59908941

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-04-29

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-04-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040324

2004-03-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-03-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020923

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000121

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT