Global Patent Index - EP 1000242 A1

EP 1000242 A1 2000-05-17 - STARTING MODE WITH A DIESEL ENGINE AND PROPULSION SYSTEM WITH SUCH AN ENGINE

Title (en)

STARTING MODE WITH A DIESEL ENGINE AND PROPULSION SYSTEM WITH SUCH AN ENGINE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM STARTEN EINES DIESELMOTORS SOWIE ANTRIEBSSYSTEM MI T EINEM DIESELMOTOR

Title (fr)

PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE FAIRE DEMARRER UN MOTEUR DIESEL ET SYSTEME D'ENTRAINEMENT COMPORTANT LEDIT MOTEUR

Publication

EP 1000242 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98945105 A

Priority

  • DE 19732630 A
  • EP 9804718 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19732630A1] The invention relates to a method for starting a diesel engine (1), comprising the following steps: no thermal auxiliary starting agent needs to be used in a range of low temperatures up to the lowest acceptable temperature or at least above a low threshold temperature; the diesel engine (1) is speeded by means of an electrical starter (4) up to a sufficiently high number of TPM to ignite the fuel without preliminary use of a thermal auxiliary starting agent; the diesel engine (1) starts. The invention also pertains to a corresponding propulsion system.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02N 17/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02N 19/00 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02N 11/08 (2013.01); F02D 41/062 (2013.01); F02N 11/04 (2013.01); F02N 11/0866 (2013.01); F02N 2200/022 (2013.01); F02N 2200/023 (2013.01); F02N 2300/102 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9906693A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19732630 A1 19990204; EP 1000242 A1 20000517; EP 1000242 B1 20030514; WO 9906693 A1 19990211

INPADOC legal status


2012-05-16 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59808376

- Effective date: 20120201

2012-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120201

2012-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110801

2012-04-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120330

2010-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100723

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100805

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070728

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050725

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-08-01 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2007-03-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060728

2006-07-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060731

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-07-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060728

2005-07-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050725

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-05-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040217

2004-03-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-09-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-06-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59808376 P 20030618

2003-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-05-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-04-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020214

2001-01-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CONTINENTAL ISAD ELECTRONIC SYSTEMS GMBH & CO. OHG

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991217

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT