Global Patent Index - EP 1000258 A1

EP 1000258 A1 2000-05-17 - CONNECTING-ROD WITH A THIN PLAIN BEARING LAYER

Title (en)

CONNECTING-ROD WITH A THIN PLAIN BEARING LAYER

Title (de)

PLEUEL MIT EINER DÜNNEN GLEITLAGERSCHICHT

Title (fr)

BIELLE COMPORTANT UNE FINE COUCHE DE PALIER LISSE

Publication

EP 1000258 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98941372 A

Priority

  • DE 19732401 A
  • DE 19733197 A
  • DE 19733930 A
  • DE 19734178 A
  • EP 9804500 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9905424A1] Bearing shells are inserted into the connecting-rod eyes of connecting rods used in internal combustion engines. The fitting of bearing shells constitutes a production step which is a potential source of defects. The aim of the new method is to create connecting rod bearings which require less assembly work and are firmly joined to the bearing metal. According to the invention the large connecting-rod eye (3) is subjected to pre-spindle trimming, cracking and further spindle trimming to the coating tolerance, sandblasted and microporously plasma-coated with an aluminium bronze. At the start of plasma spraying the plasma layer is deposited at a high temperature, which results in good adhesion of the plasma layer to the material of the connecting-rod eye and low porosity of the plasma layer. To prevent annealing of the material of the connecting-rod eye the deposit temperature of the plasma layer is lowered for that area which is removed by subsequent working of said plasma layer. After plasma coating the connecting-rod eye is opened by removing the bearing cap (9), which ruptures the plasma layer (16). The cap (9) is then screwed back on and the actual sliding layer created by fine spindle trimming. To improve the oil retention volume the plasma layer (16) has an annular groove (32). The invention is used in internal combustion engines.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F16C 7/02; F16C 33/14; C23C 4/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16C 33/12 (2006.01); C23C 4/00 (2006.01); C23C 4/12 (2006.01); C23C 4/16 (2006.01); F16C 7/02 (2006.01); F16C 9/04 (2006.01); F16C 33/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F16C 33/10 (2013.01); C23C 4/12 (2013.01); C23C 4/16 (2013.01); F16C 9/045 (2013.01); F16C 33/103 (2013.01); F16C 33/14 (2013.01); F16C 2220/60 (2013.01); F16C 2223/42 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9905424 A1 19990204; CN 1162624 C 20040818; CN 1265181 A 20000830; EP 1000258 A1 20000517; ES 2207854 T3 20040601; JP 2001511501 A 20010814; KR 20010014087 A 20010226

INPADOC legal status


2011-10-12 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20110609

2011-06-09 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2007-01-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020617

2002-07-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020617

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000228

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT PT SE