Global patent index - EP 1000294 A1

EP 1000294 A1 2000-05-17 - MOTOR VEHICLE HEADLIGHT WITH MIRROR EQUIPPED WITH AT LEAST ONE LATERAL FENDER SKIRT

Title (en)

MOTOR VEHICLE HEADLIGHT WITH MIRROR EQUIPPED WITH AT LEAST ONE LATERAL FENDER SKIRT

Title (de)

REFLEKTOR FÜR EINEN KFZ-SCHEINWERFER MIT MINDESTENS EINER SEITENFLÄCHE

Title (fr)

PROJECTEUR DE VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE A MIROIR DOTE D'AU MOINS UNE JOUE LATERALE

Publication

EP 1000294 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99937975 A

Priority

  • FR 9900471 W
  • FR 9802614 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2775640A1] The invention concerns a motor vehicle headlight comprising a light source (10) co-operating with a mirror (10), and a lens, the mirror comprising an end wall (21) and at least a lateral fender skirt (22, 23) exposed to the light radiating from the source. The invention is characterised in that at least one of the fender skirts (22, 23) is capable in at least one zone of reflecting the light to prolong uninterruptedly and laterally the beam generated by the mirror end wall (21), substantially without enhancing said beam in the road axis; the lens is smooth or very slightly deflecting. The invention is applicable to homogeneous light beams having large dimensions.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 7/00 (2006.01); F21S 8/10 (2006.01); F21V 7/09 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 48/1382 (2013.01); F21S 48/119 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9945311A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2775640 A1 19990910; FR 2775640 B1 20000526; DE 69935700 D1 20070516; DE 69935700 T2 20071227; EP 1000294 A1 20000517; EP 1000294 B1 20070404; ES 2285853 T3 20071116; JP 2001523387 A 20011120; US 2002024817 A1 20020228; US 6543919 B2 20030408; WO 9945311 A1 19990910

INPADOC legal status

2014-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140314

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-04-24 [REG DE R107] PUBLICATION OF GRANT OF EUROPEAN PATENT RESCINDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: R107

- Ref Document Number: 69935700

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140424

2014-03-19 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20131114

2013-11-14 [REG DE R064] EPO'S REVOCATION DECISION NOW FINAL

- Ref Legal Event Code: R064

- Ref Document Number: 69935700

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-11-14 [REG DE R103] PATENT REVOKED BY EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: R103

- Ref Document Number: 69935700

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-07-24 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: AUTOMOTIVE LIGHTING REUTLINGEN GMBH

- Effective date: 20080102

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130311

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130320

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120326

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080303

2008-11-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20080303

2008-02-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: AUTOMOTIVE LIGHTING REUTLINGEN GMBH

- Effective date: 20080102

2007-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2285853

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2007-09-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20070903

2007-05-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69935700

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2007-05-16

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2007-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2007-04-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-10-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: F21V 7/00 20060101AFI20060914BHEP

2006-10-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: F21S 8/10 20060101ALI20060914BHEP

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT