Global Patent Index - EP 1000311 A1

EP 1000311 A1 2000-05-17 - PROJECTILE OR WARHEAD

Title (en)

PROJECTILE OR WARHEAD

Title (de)

GESCHOSS ODER GEFECHTSKOPF

Title (fr)

PROJECTILE OU OGIVE

Publication

EP 1000311 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 97948667 A

Priority

  • CH 9700477 W
  • DE 19700349 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9830863A1] A projectile or warhead for fighting armoured targets has a material (1) with practically no end ballistic effect as an expanding medium radially enveloped by an outer body made of a penetration material (2) with a distinctly higher end ballistic effect. The expanding medium (1) may be made of a light metal, duro- or thermoplastic materials, fibre-reinforced plastics, elastomeric materials or a dense and dynamically soft metal. The expanding medium (1) may further contain substances with a pyrophoric and/or explosive effect, possibly as a powder or liquid. Strips (20) or other bodies (21, 24, 25) may be embedded in the outer body. The outer body (2) may be made of high-density sintered metal, of a brittle material or of very hard steel. The outer body may break into splinters. A massive penetrator (6) or several penetrators (26) may be arranged at the centre of the expanding medium. The projectile has a tip (38, 41) and is spin-stabilised or aerodynamically stabilised as a full calibre projectile or as a subcalibre pierce-and-seal projectile. The projectiles may be expelled from dispensers. The projectiles or warheads can be mounted on guided or non-guided missiles.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F42B 12/06; F42B 12/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 12/06 (2006.01); F42B 12/34 (2006.01); F42B 12/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 12/367 (2013.01); F42B 12/06 (2013.01); F42B 12/204 (2013.01); F42B 12/34 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9830863A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9830863 A1 19980716; AT 333632 T 20060815; AU 7995198 A 19980803; CA 2277205 A1 19980716; CA 2277205 C 20050628; CN 1087421 C 20020710; CN 1265189 A 20000830; DE 19700349 C1 19980820; DE 19700349 C2 20020207; DK 1000311 T3 20061113; EA 001318 B1 20010226; EA 199900625 A1 20000228; EP 1000311 A1 20000517; EP 1000311 B1 20060719; ES 2273375 T3 20070501; HK 1030449 A1 20030328; IL 130764 A 20020912; IL 130764 D0 20010128; NO 317805 B1 20041213; NO 993299 A 19990702; NO 993299 D0 19990702; PT 1000311 E 20061229; TR 9902111 T2 19991221; TW 396269 B 20000701; US 2004129163 A1 20040708; US 2004129164 A1 20040708; US 2004129166 A1 20040708; US 6659013 B1 20031209; US 6772695 B2 20040810; US 6772696 B2 20040810; US 6789484 B2 20040914; ZA 9711550 B 19980625

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20161220

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20161222

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20161213

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-02-28 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20161221

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20161221

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161222

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20161221

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20161221

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20161221

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161222

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-01-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20161213

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-12-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151228

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-01-22 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Effective date: 20131227

2007-12-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: *RHEINMETALL WAFFE MUNITION G.M.B.H.PEMPELFURSTRAS

- Effective date: 20060719

2007-12-31 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: *RHEINMETALL WAFFE MUNITION G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20060719

2007-10-26 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2007-06-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070420

2007-05-09 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2007-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2273375 T3

2007-04-25 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: RHEINMETALL WAFFE MUNITION GMBH

2007-03-30 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: RHEINMETALL WAFFE MUNITION GMBH, DE

- Effective date: 20070227

2007-02-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-01-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2006-12-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20061016

2006-12-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20061110

2006-11-30 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: RHEINMETALL WAFFE MUNITION GMBH

- Free text: FUTURTEC AG#C/O BEELER + BEELER TREUHAND AG LETTENSTRASSE 7-9#6443 ROTKREUZ / ZUG (CH) -TRANSFER TO- RHEINMETALL WAFFE MUNITION GMBH#PEMPELFURTSTRASSE 1#40880 RATINGEN (DE)

2006-11-23 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20060403626

2006-11-13 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2006-11-07 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-10-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: OK PAT AG PATENTE MARKEN LIZENZEN

2006-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-08-10 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2006-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

2006-07-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-07-19 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060719

2006-06-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FUTURTEC AG

2001-02-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010102

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990914

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE