Global patent index - EP 1000314 A2

EP 1000314 A2 2000-05-17 - DISTANCE MEASURING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING A DISTANCE

Title (en)

DISTANCE MEASURING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING A DISTANCE

Title (de)

ABSTANDSMESSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINES ABSTANDS

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE MESURER UNE DISTANCE

Publication

EP 1000314 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98945135 A

Priority

  • DE 19733109 A
  • DE 19807593 A
  • EP 9804815 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6445191B1] Described is a distance-measuring device and a method for determining a distance, which uses a sensor in the form of a cavity resonator to continuously perform a distance determination and allows diverse possible uses.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01B 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01F 23/284 (2006.01); F15B 15/12 (2006.01); F15B 15/28 (2006.01); G01B 15/00 (2006.01); G01G 3/13 (2006.01); G01L 9/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 15/2869 (2013.01); F15B 15/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9906788A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

US 6445191 B1 20020903; EP 1000314 A2 20000517; EP 1000314 B1 20020410; ES 2177050 T3 20021201; JP 2001512229 A 20010821; WO 9906788 A2 19990211; WO 9906788 A3 19990408

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160725

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-11-12 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59803757

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: KUNZ, HERBERT, DIPL.-PHYS. DR.RER.NAT., DE

2015-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150728

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-09-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59803757

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: KUNZ, HERBERT, DIPL.-PHYS. DR.RER.NAT., DE

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150629

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-03-24 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59803757

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: KUNZ, HERBERT, DIPL.-PHYS. DR.RER.NAT., DE

2012-03-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59803757

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: DR. KUNZ & KOLLEGEN PATENTANWALTSKANZLEI, DE

2012-03-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59803757

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: KUNZ, HERBERT, DIPL.-PHYS. DR.RER.NAT., DE

2007-06-16 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

2007-04-13 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Ref Legal Event Code: CA

2007-04-13 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2003-04-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030113

2002-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2177050

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-10-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020913

2002-10-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-05-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59803757

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-05-16

2002-04-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-04-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: TRUMMER, GUENTHER

2002-04-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: DR.JOSEF WENGER

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010405

2001-05-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: TRUMMER, GUENTHER

2001-05-16 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: DR.JOSEF WENGER

2001-04-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7G 01B 1/00 A, 7G 01B 15/00 B

2001-04-04 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: DISTANCE DETERMINATION WITH AN OPEN CAVITY RESONATOR

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000131

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT