Global Patent Index - EP 1000421 A1

EP 1000421 A1 2000-05-17 - HOME EMERGENCY WARNING SYSTEM

Title (en)

HOME EMERGENCY WARNING SYSTEM

Title (de)

NOTFALL-ÜBERWACHUNGSSYSTEM FÜR WOHNUNGEN

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE SURVEILLANCE D'URGENCE POUR APPARTEMENTS

Publication

EP 1000421 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98947367 A

Priority

  • DE 9802186 W
  • DE 19733408 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9906979A1] In a self-sufficient home emergency warning system, the user needs not carry any signalling devices. A critical situation can be reported to an external receiver by voice input via microphones (1, 2, 3) linked to a communications interface (11). Moreover, a person (4) can be monitored by sensor systems (6, 7, 8) which can also establish an external connection via the communications interface (11).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 21/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08B 21/02 (2006.01); G08B 21/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 21/0415 (2013.01); G08B 21/02 (2013.01); G08B 21/0469 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9906979A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9906979 A1 19990211; EP 1000421 A1 20000517; EP 1000421 B1 20010704; US 6313743 B1 20011106

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130730

2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130730

2014-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130731

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-04-30 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59800972

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140331

2014-03-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130730

2014-03-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120906

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-12-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120802

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120726

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20120710

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120709

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-06-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-09-27 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2001-09-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010830

2001-08-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800972 20010809

2001-07-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2001-01-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001205

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000121

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE