Global patent index - EP 1000433 A1

EP 1000433 A1 2000-05-17 - METHOD FOR MAKING AN ELECTRON SOURCE WITH MICROTIPS, WITH SELF-ALIGNED FOCUSING GRID

Title (en)

METHOD FOR MAKING AN ELECTRON SOURCE WITH MICROTIPS, WITH SELF-ALIGNED FOCUSING GRID

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER MIKROSPITZEN-ELEKTRONENQUELLE, MIT SELBSTJUSTIERTER FOKUSSIERELEKTRODE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UNE SOURCE D'ELECTRONS A MICROPOINTES, A GRILLE DE FOCALISATION AUTO-ALIGNEE

Publication

EP 1000433 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99920914 A

Priority

  • FR 9901218 W
  • FR 9806607 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2779271A1] The invention concerns a method for making an electron source with microtips (67), with extraction grid and with focusing grid. Said method enables to align accurately the extraction grid (65) holes (61) with the focusing grid (66) openings using a single photolithography step, that which enables to produce the extraction grid holes. The invention is useful for producing a microtip electron source for flat display.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 3/02 (2006.01); H01J 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 9/025 (2013.01); H01J 3/022 (2013.01); H01J 2329/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9962093A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2779271 A1 19991203; FR 2779271 B1 20000707; DE 69909708 D1 20030828; DE 69909708 T2 20040415; EP 1000433 A1 20000517; EP 1000433 B1 20030723; JP 2002517065 A 20020611; US 6210246 B1 20010403; WO 9962093 A1 19991202

INPADOC legal status

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080525

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080525

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081202

2009-01-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20080525

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070507

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070523

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-06-15 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070615

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-05-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060524

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-07-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040426

2003-11-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20031105

2003-08-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69909708

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-08-28

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-07-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2003-07-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000113

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT