Global Patent Index - EP 1000487 A1

EP 1000487 A1 2000-05-17 - TELECOMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM

Title (en)

TELECOMMUNICATIONS SYSTEM

Title (de)

TELEKOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE TELECOMMUNICATION

Publication

EP 1000487 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98939651 A

Priority

  • DE 19733586 A
  • EP 9804822 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19733586C1] The invention relates to a telecommunications system comprising a plurality of stations (S), each of which has a transmission and a receiving device. Every station (S) can directly exchange information with a limited number of neighbouring stations. To build a route from a source station (SS) to a target station (ST) the geographical data of the two stations and the target direction of the connection to be established are determined. Depending on this target direction the source station (SS) determines a neighbouring station (SN1) which is approximately in that direction. From the neighbouring station (SN1) a new target direction to the target station (ST) is determined, after which the next station (S) corresponding to this new target direction is determined. This step is repeated until the target station (ST) has been reached.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04L 12/56

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04L 12/717 (2013.01); H04L 12/721 (2013.01); H04L 12/751 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04L 45/02 (2013.01); H04L 45/12 (2013.01); H04L 45/42 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9907115A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19733586 C1 19990211; AU 8808498 A 19990222; EP 1000487 A1 20000517; WO 9907115 A1 19990211

INPADOC legal status


2007-03-16 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1029878

2005-07-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030301

2005-01-12 [32PN] PUBLIC NOTIFICATION UNDER RULE 80 EPC

- Free text: FESTSTELLUNG EINES RECHTSVERLUSTS (REGEL 69 (1) EPUE) DATIERT VOM 23.04.2003LETZTE ANSCHRIFT: DIRC TECHNOLOGIE GMBH & CO. KG, BORSIGSTRASSE

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000125

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE