Global Patent Index - EP 1000526 A2

EP 1000526 A2 2000-05-17 - ACOUSTIC COUPLER

Title (en)

ACOUSTIC COUPLER

Title (de)

AKUSTISCHER KOPPLER

Title (fr)

COUPLEUR ACOUSTIQUE

Publication

EP 1000526 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 98933150 A

Priority

  • US 9813890 W
  • US 90240197 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9907182A2] An acoustic coupler is detachably secured to a receiver assembly for deep insertion into an individual's ear canal. The acoustic coupler provides a semirigid, thin walled, cylindrical coupling sleeve that is adapted to be attached over a cylindrical receiver assembly. A conforming sealing material is attached diametrically over the coupling sleeve to fit comfortably and to seal the individual's ear canal acoustically. The coupling sleeve is substantially concentric to the receiver assembly for a highly space efficient interface and a user friendly replacement method. Attachment of the acoustic coupler to the receiver assembly is accomplished by applying a minimal axial (push) force to secure the acoustic coupler to the receiver assembly. The coupler remains securely attached thereto, and can withstand considerable axial detachment (pull) forces without being dislodged within or outside the ear canal. Applying a rotational (twist) force with respect to the receiver housing detaches the acoustic coupler from the receiver housing. Because rotational movements are minimal during insertion or removal of the coupler from the individual's ear, accidental detachment is not possible.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 25/02; H04R 25/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 25/02 (2006.01); H04R 25/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 25/656 (2013.01); H04R 25/456 (2013.01); H04R 25/658 (2013.01); H04R 2460/11 (2013.01); H04R 2460/17 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9907182A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9907182 A2 19990211; WO 9907182 A3 19990422; AR 012683 A1 20001108; AU 725594 B2 20001012; AU 8287998 A 19990222; CA 2297659 A1 19990211; CN 1265817 A 20000906; EP 1000526 A2 20000517; JP 2001512943 A 20010828

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050201

2004-03-03 [D18D] EP-APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN: (DELETED)

2003-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: K/S HIMPP

2002-09-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020201

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000207

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK FR GB LI