Global Patent Index - EP 1000559 A2

EP 1000559 A2 2000-05-17 - Bag with zip-lock closure actuated by a slider

Title (en)

Bag with zip-lock closure actuated by a slider

Title (de)

Beutel mit durch einen Schieber betätigten Verschlussprofilen

Title (fr)

Sachet comprenant des profilés de fermeture complémentaires actionnés par curseur

Publication

EP 1000559 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 99402702 A

Priority

FR 9813734 A

Abstract (en)

The bag (10) consists of two basically flat layers (16, 18) forming its side walls with interlocking closure strips (20, 22) along their opening edges. It is opened and closed by a slider (50) which has a central projection (59) of varying cross-section to part the strips, and ribs (520, 540) on either side of its opening to press the edges of the bag together and ensure a seal when the bag is closed. The bag can also have seal lips inside the closure strips.

Abstract (fr)

La présente invention concerne un sachet comportant deux feuilles généralement parallèles (16, 18) formant les parois principales du sachet, des profilés de fermeture complémentaires (20, 22) fixés respectivement sur ces feuilles (16, 18) au niveau de l'embouchure du sachet et un curseur (50) comportant deux ailes latérales (52, 54) reliées entre elles au niveau d'une embase (56), placées sur l'extérieur des feuilles (16, 18) au niveau de l'embouchure du sachet et qui définissent avec une semelle centrale allongée (59), deux couloirs (590, 592) de passage convergents pour les profilés de fermeture complémentaires (20, 22), caractérisé par le fait que la semelle (59) est interrompue en retrait de l'extrémité longitudinale du curseur (50), au moins sur le côté le plus large du curseur correspondant au côté divergent des couloirs de passage (590, 592), et que les ailes latérales (52, 54) sont munies au voisinage de leur bord libre opposé à l'embase (56), de moyens (520, 540 ; 100) de sollicitation des feuilles (16, 18) du sachet en rapprochement, couvrant toute l'étendue longitudinale de la semelle (59) et s'étendant au delà longitudinalement de part et d'autre de celle-ci, pour assurer l'étanchéité du sachet en position fermée de celui-ci. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A44B 19/26; B65D 33/25

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A44B 19/26 (2006.01); B65D 33/25 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 33/2591 (2013.01); A44B 19/267 (2013.01); Y10T 24/2532 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

FR 2785259 A1 20000505; FR 2785259 B1 20011207; DE 69937869 D1 20080214; DE 69937869 T2 20090102; DK 1000559 T3 20080428; EP 1000559 A2 20000517; EP 1000559 A3 20000816; EP 1000559 B1 20080102; ES 2297916 T3 20080501; US 6305844 B1 20011023

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161028

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131030

2015-04-07 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150407

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140501

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131029

2014-07-24 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69937869

- Effective date: 20140501

2014-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131029

2013-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20121123

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121127

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121113

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091031

2010-06-07 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2009-01-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20081030

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-12-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20081003

2008-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2297916 T3

2008-04-28 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2008-03-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20080227

2008-02-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69937869 P 20080214

2008-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB

2008-01-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2007-01-10 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB

2006-10-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: S2F FLEXICO

2006-08-02 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB

2003-01-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021203

2001-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE DK ES FR GB

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010214

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI