Global Patent Index - EP 1000562 A2

EP 1000562 A2 2000-05-17 - Apparatus for pinching hairs from the human skin

Title (en)

Apparatus for pinching hairs from the human skin

Title (de)

Gerät zum Auszupfen von Haaren der menschlichen Haut

Title (fr)

Appareil pour enlever les poils de la peau humaine

Publication

EP 1000562 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00102416 A

Priority

  • DE 19521585 A
  • EP 96918666 A

Abstract (en)

The means to reduce the pain sensation has an element (16) that impacts on the skin (21) when the hair is pulled out. It evokes a mechanical and/or electrical impulse that causes a pain with the same characteristic as the pulling sensation but with a lower pain amplitude. The element is linked with the rotating movement of the clamping device and is positioned in front of it. The element is moved by centrifugal force and/or spring force and/or a cam between two positions. The first (22) is within the diameter of the clamping device the other (23) protruding from the diameter.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Gerät zum Auszupfen von Haaren der menschlichen Haut (21) beschrieben, das ein Gehäuse zur Aufnahme eines Motors aufweist, in dem ein Antrieb für mindestes eine Klemmvorrichtung untergebracht ist, mit deren Hilfe die Haare eines Benutzers ausgezupft werden können. Des weiteren sind Mittel vorgesehen zur Verminderung des Schmerzempfindens während des Auszupfens der Haare. Diese Mittel weisen mindestens ein Element (16) auf, das unmittelbar vor jedem Auszupfen von Haaren einen einmaligen Impuls an die Haut (21) abgibt. Dieser Impuls verursacht beim Benutzer einen Schmerz, der als weniger unangenehm als der eigentliche stechende Schmerz beim Auszupfen von Haaren empfunden wird, und der diesen stechenden Schmerz überlagert. Dies hat zur Folge, daß der Benutzer zumindest subjektiv ein vermindertes Schmerzempfinden beim Auszupfen von Haaren empfindet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45D 26/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45D 26/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45D 26/0028 (2013.01); A45D 26/0061 (2013.01); A45D 2200/207 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19521585 A1 19961219; AT 1944 U2 19980225; AT 1944 U3 19980727; AT 452555 T 20100115; AU 6124796 A 19970115; AU 714490 B2 20000106; BR 9608491 A 19990706; DE 59611503 D1 20100204; EP 0814682 A1 19980107; EP 0814682 B1 20020206; EP 1000562 A2 20000517; EP 1000562 A3 20020213; EP 1000562 B1 20091223; ES 2337759 T3 20100429; PL 179983 B1 20001130; PL 324005 A1 19980427; PT 814682 E 20020628; RU 2162653 C2 20010210; TR 9701610 T1 19980421; US 2002072756 A1 20020613; US 2002128665 A1 20020912; US 2002133177 A1 20020919; US 2005055036 A1 20050310; US 6083233 A 20000704; US 6293953 B1 20010925; US 6730099 B1 20040504; US 7147645 B2 20061212; US 7195635 B2 20070327; US 7211090 B2 20070501; WO 9700032 A1 19970103

INPADOC legal status


2016-06-04 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59611503

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150630

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150528

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-05-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140630

2015-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140630

2015-01-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120605

2013-10-21 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20131021

2013-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130528

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130101

2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120604

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120604

2013-02-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120604

2013-01-16 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130101

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110620

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100604

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110523

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20110615

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20110603

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100630

2011-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20091223

2010-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: BRAUN G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20100630

2010-12-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20100924

2010-10-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100324

2010-10-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20091223

2010-07-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100423

2010-07-21 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2010-05-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20091223

2010-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20091223

2010-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20091223

2010-04-29 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2337759 T3

2010-03-24 [REG NL T3] TRANSLATION FILES FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995

2010-02-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59611503 P 20100204

2010-01-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOHEST AG

2010-01-20 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2009-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2009-12-23 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0814682 P

2009-12-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2009-12-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: LT LV SI

2009-12-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-07-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030514

2002-10-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2002-10-30 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 20000204;LV PAYMENT 20000204;SI PAYMENT 20000204

2002-02-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2002-02-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 20000204;LV PAYMENT 20000204;SI PAYMENT 20000204

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000204

2000-05-17 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 814682

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: LT PAYMENT 20000204;LV PAYMENT 20000204;SI PAYMENT 20000204