Global Patent Index - EP 1000564 A1

EP 1000564 A1 2000-05-17 - Removable handle to attach and carry loads

Title (en)

Removable handle to attach and carry loads

Title (de)

Abnehmbarer Griff zum Ergreifen und Tragen von Lasten

Title (fr)

Dispositif amovible pour la préhension et le port de charges

Publication

EP 1000564 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99400489 A

Priority

FR 9814153 A

Abstract (en)

The carrying handle (10), which has a rounded non-slip surface, is mounted on top of a supporting bar (18) with hooks (11, 12, 13, 14) designed to receive the handles of carrier bags or strings tied round parcels. Each hook has two slots (111, 112; 121, 122; 131, 132; 141, 142), an insertion slot and a retaining slot, lying at an angle to one another of over 45 and preferably more than 90 degrees. Each insertion slot has an inner projection (113, 123, 133, 143) close to its inlet. The handle can also have slots (101, 102) to receive coins (30).

Abstract (fr)

L'invention est relative à un dispositif amovible pour la préhension et le port de charges, comprenant une poignée à laquelle est associé au moins un élément d'accrochage de la poignée sur au moins une charge. Selon l'invention, l'élément d'accrochage (11, 12, 13, 14), situé sous la poignée (10), comporte une encoche (110, 120, 130, 140) formée d'une première fente d'introduction (111, 121, 131, 141) pour une anse, lien ou analogue qui communique avec une deuxième fente de réception (112, 122, 132, 142), laquelle forme avec ladite première fente d'introduction un angle supérieur à 45° et, de préférence, supérieur à 90° et assure le blocage de ladite anse, lien ou analogue dans l'encoche, sous l'effet de la gravité. L'invention s'applique au port de charges. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45F 5/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45F 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45F 5/1026 (2013.01); A45F 2005/1033 (2013.01); A45F 2005/1073 (2013.01); A45F 2005/1086 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1000564 A1 20000517; BR 9901983 A 20000530; CA 2258810 A1 20000510; CN 1259476 A 20000712; FR 2785592 A1 20000512; FR 2785592 B1 20010406

INPADOC legal status


2007-05-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20061003

2001-05-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010329

2001-01-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001117

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI