Global patent index - EP 1000601 A2

EP 1000601 A2 2000-05-17 - Device for vibration therapy

Title (en)

Device for vibration therapy

Title (de)

Gerät zur Vibrationstherapie

Title (fr)

Dispositif vibratoire thérapeutique

Publication

EP 1000601 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99122303 A

Priority

  • DE 19852608 A
  • US 44078999 A

Abstract (en)

The device has a motor-driven oscillation exciter connected to an vibrator head (10). The drive shaft of the vibrator head forms an angle ( alpha ) with the drive shaft (2) of the exciter. The drive shaft is mounted in a casing (1) by ball-bearings (6) with its stub (3) in a bore (4) running in line with the drive shaft axis. The exciter engages the vibrator head in a holder part at an angle to the drive shaft axis.

Abstract (de)

Gegenstand der Erfindung ist ein Gerät, insbesondere ein Handgerät zur Vibrationstherapie zwecks Behandlung vornehmlich der Muskeln und des Knochengerüstes. Das erfindungsgemäße Gerät vermittelt eine Taumelbewegung des Schwingkopfes bei Drehung der Antriebswelle durch die Maßnahme, daß ein Winkel zwischen den Antriebswellen des Schwingerregers und des Schwingkopfes gebildet ist. Das Gerät ist kompakt konzipiert, leicht sowie verschleißarm und ermöglicht eine preiswerte Herstellung. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61H 23/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61H 23/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61H 23/0254 (2013.01); A61H 2201/0153 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 19634650 A1 19980305 - RUF TECHNIK GMBH [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1000601 A2 20000517; EP 1000601 A3 20020320; DE 19852608 A1 20000518; DE 19852608 C2 20001214; US 6352518 B1 20020305

INPADOC legal status

2006-12-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20060601

2002-12-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE ES IT LI NL

2002-03-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001017

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES IT LI NL

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI