Global Patent Index - EP 1000636 A1

EP 1000636 A1 2000-05-17 - Extinguisher with reservoir, discharge head and flexible conduit

Title (en)

Extinguisher with reservoir, discharge head and flexible conduit

Title (de)

Feuerlöscher mit Behälter, Ausstosskopf und biegsame Leitung

Title (fr)

Extincteur comprenant un réservoir, une tête de décharge et un conduit flexible

Publication

EP 1000636 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99420225 A

Priority

FR 9814370 A

Abstract (en)

The fire extinguisher (1), consisting of a reservoir (2) for the extinguishing fluid and a discharge head (7) with a nozzle (7a) connected to the reservoir by a flexible tube (6), has a cap (4) to protect the coupling system between the tube and reservoir. One edge (4c) of the cap and the adjacent surface of the reservoir form a recess (10) which receives the flexible tube when it is not in use. The cap also has a zone (4a) through which the tube passes to engage with the coupling system and a zone (4b) to receive and retain the discharge head with its hand guard (37). A cavity in the cap holds the pull ring (32) of a valve locking pin.

Abstract (fr)

Cet extincteur (1) comprend un réservoir (2) de fluide de traitement d'incendie et une tête de décharge (7) de ce fluide reliée au réservoir par un tuyau flexible (6) et apte à être immobilisée par rapport au réservoir (2), le réservoir étant équipé d'une coiffe (4) de protection de moyens de raccordement du volume intérieur du réservoir avec le conduit flexible (6). Un bord (4c) de la coiffe (4) et la surface externe (2a) du réservoir définissent une zone (10) de réception du tuyau flexible (6), sur l'essentiel de sa longueur, au voisinage immédiat du réservoir (2). L'invention permet d'éviter les risques d'accrochage et/ou de sectionnement du tuyau flexible (6) au cours des manipulations de l'extincteur (1) et facilite son stockage. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A62C 13/76

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62C 13/76 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62C 13/76 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

FR 2674759 A1 19921009 - SICLI [FR]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1000636 A1 20000517; FR 2785818 A1 20000519; FR 2785818 B1 20010323

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20081014

2008-05-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080403

2006-08-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: USINES DESAUTEL

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000901

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI