Global Patent Index - EP 1000641 A1

EP 1000641 A1 2000-05-17 - Gliding device comprising a binding interface connected to a ski

Title (en)

Gliding device comprising a binding interface connected to a ski

Title (de)

Gleitgerät mit ein Bindungsträgerplatte an einem Ski

Title (fr)

Engin de glisse comprenant un dispositif d'interface de fixations relié à un ski

Publication

EP 1000641 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99121519 A

Priority

FR 9814601 A

Abstract (en)

The ski's central section, where the boot fastenings are mounted, has two zones (100, 101) of increased thickness where the ski's upper surface is convex in shape, with a progressive increase and decrease in thickness in each zone. In between the two convex zones the ski has an intermediate zone (102) where its thickness may constant and equal to the thickness before and after the two convex zones, or concave in shape with its thickness gradually reducing to below that before and after the convex zones and then increasing again. In another variant the intermediate zone can be fitted with a reinforcing member (80).

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un engin de glisse comprenant un dispositif d'interface de fixations relié à un ski ; le dispositif comprenant : une platine avant (4) présentant une zone de montage (5) prévue pour un élément de retenue avant, une platine arrière (8) avec une zone de montage (9) prévue pour un élément de retenue arrière, une liaison (10) entre les deux platines avant et arrière, chaque platine se prolongeant le long de chaque chant du ski par un aileron inférieur (17, 18, 19, 20), et pour chaque aileron un élément tourillonnant (48a, 48b, 49a, 49b) de fixation des ailerons au ski caractérisé en ce que, le ski comprend, sur au moins une portion de sa largeur, une augmentation locale d'épaisseur dans deux zones (100, 101) espacées longitudinalement de fixation du dispositif d'interface et correspondant à la fixation des éléments tourillonnants (48a, 48b ; 49a, 49b). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 9/00 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 9/003 (2013.01); A63C 9/007 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1000641 A1 20000517; FR 2785823 A1 20000519; FR 2785823 B1 20010302; JP 3068970 U 20000526; US 6412807 B1 20020702

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-30 [R18D] EP-APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN: (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20050503

2005-11-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050303

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR IT LI

2001-01-31 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 19991029

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001117

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI PAYMENT 19991029