Global patent index - EP 1000662 A1

EP 1000662 A1 2000-05-17 - Apparatus for polishing grains, especially rice

Title (en)

Apparatus for polishing grains, especially rice

Title (de)

Maschine zum Schleifen von Körnerfrüchten, insbesondere Reis

Title (fr)

Appareil pour meuler des graines, en particulier du riz

Publication

EP 1000662 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98710016 A

Priority

EP 98710016 A

Abstract (en)

The polishing machine polishes the rice in an annular cavity (11) with a vertical axis bounded on the outside by a jacket (4) with breakthroughs and on the inside by a co-axial rotor (8). The rice is fed in by a forcible-feed conveyor (21). The jacket and the rotor are in the shape of truncated cones. The rice is fed in at the upper narrow end of the cavity, the lower end of which has a yielding closing member (32).

Abstract (de)

Maschine zum Schleifen von Körnerfrüchten, insbesondere Reis, in einem Ringraum (11) mit vertikaler Achse, der außen von einem Durchbrechungen enthaltenen Mantel (4) und innenseitig von einem dazu koaxialen Rotor (8) begrenzt ist und dem das zu schleifende Gut mittels eines Zwangsförderers (21) zugeführt wird. Um die Maschinenleistung bei größerer Schonung des Guts zu steigern, sind der Mantel (4) und der Rotor (8) kegelstumpfförmig, ist die Gutzuführung am oberen, engeren Ende des Ringraums (11) vorgesehen und ist dessen unteres Ende mit einem nachgiebigen Verschlußglied (32) versehen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B02B 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B02B 3/00 (2006.01); B02B 3/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B02B 3/04 (2013.01); B02B 3/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0521452 B1 19950816 - F H SCHULE MUEHLENBAU GMBH [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GR IT PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1000662 A1 20000517; EP 1000662 B1 20010905; BR 9901307 A 20010320; DE 59801402 D1 20011011; ES 2163245 T3 20020116; TW 500633 B 20020901; US 6193179 B1 20010227

INPADOC legal status

2011-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-08-11 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59801402

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110531

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100121

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071112

2008-10-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070604

2008-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061113

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2008-02-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20061113

2007-08-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20070731

2006-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061130

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-11-25 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051125

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-11-22 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051122

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-11-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051118

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-08-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-02-28 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

- Ref Document Number: 20010402132

- Country of Ref Document: GR

2002-01-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2163245

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-01-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-12-05 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011205

2001-10-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59801402

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-10-11

2001-09-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GR IT PT

2001-01-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GR IT PT

2000-11-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000919

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990707

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GR IT PT

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI