Global Patent Index - EP 1000663 A1

EP 1000663 A1 2000-05-17 - Device for separating magnetisable parts from flowable or pourable material

Title (en)

Device for separating magnetisable parts from flowable or pourable material

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Abscheiden von magnetisierbaren Teilen aus schütt- oder fliessfähigem Gut

Title (fr)

Appareil pour la séparation des parties magnétisables d'un matériau en vrac coulable ou déversable

Publication

EP 1000663 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99121457 A

Priority

DE 19852142 A

Abstract (en)

Apparatus for removing magnetic particles includes helical magnetic rods which are rotatable by means of a motor at the longitudinal axis of the tube (3). Apparatus for removing magnetic particles from charged- or flowable material has (a) a chamber which has an inlet (1.1) for charged material, outlet (1.2) for the purified material and an outlet (1.3) for the magnetizable particles; (b) several bar grates (2,12,22) which are arranged in the stream direction of the material; (c) rods comprising a tube (3) and a helical magnetic rod (4) with magnets (4.3) enclosed; (d) magnets (4.3) arranged helically to the tube axis; and (e) helical magnetic rods.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung zum kontinuierlichen Abscheiden von magnetisierbaren Teilchen aus schütt- oder fließfähigem Gut; mit einer Kammer, die einen Einlaß für das teilchenbeladene Gut, einen Auslaß für das gereinigte Gut und einen Auslaß für die magnetisierbaren Teilchen aufweist; mit einer Anzahl von Stabrosten, die im Strömungsweg des Gutes angeordnet sind; die Stäbe umfassen jeweils ein Rohr sowie einen von diesem umschlossenen Wendelmagnetstab mit Magneten; die Magnete sind wendelartig zur Rohrachse angeordnet; die Wendelmagnetstäbe sind jeweils durch einen Antrieb um die Längsachse des Rohres verdrehbar. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B03C 1/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B03C 1/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B03C 1/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1000663 A1 20000517; EP 1000663 B1 20040317; DE 19852142 A1 20000525; DE 19852142 C2 20010816

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071028

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050923

- Year of fee payment: 7

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061028

2007-07-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070501

2007-06-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061028

2007-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070501

2007-05-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070501

2006-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20051130

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-10-25 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20051025

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-09-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050923

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041220

2004-04-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59908864 P 20040422

2004-04-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040317

2004-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT NL

2004-03-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030425

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB IT NL

2000-10-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALLGAIER-WERKE GMBH

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000311

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT NL

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI