Global Patent Index - EP 1000689 A1

EP 1000689 A1 2000-05-17 - Machine for decoring castings

Title (en)

Machine for decoring castings

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Entkernen von Gussstücken

Title (fr)

Dispositif de débourrage de pièces coulées

Publication

EP 1000689 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98830686 A

Priority

EP 98830686 A

Abstract (en)

A machine for shaking-out foundry castings comprises a structure (2) for supporting the castings (G) to be shaken out, and vibrator means (8) associated with the support structure (2) for selectively vibrating the support structure (2). The support structure (2) comprises at least a first portion (2a) with associated fixing means (3, 4) for the castings (G) to be shaken out, and a second portion (2b) which is subject to the action of the vibrator means (8, 9). The first portion (2a) is supported (12) relative to the second portion (2b) as a vibrating system, and the vibrator means (8) are operable selectively (9, K) in order to bring about vibration of the second portion (2b) and vibration of the vibrating system (2a, 12) in conditions of substantial resonance. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 29/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 29/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 29/005 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1000689 A1 20000517

INPADOC legal status


2004-08-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031120

2003-08-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030709

2001-01-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001020

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI