Global Patent Index - EP 1000710 A1

EP 1000710 A1 2000-05-17 - Method of mesuring and/or controlling in a fastening device including a hydropneumatic impulse screw driver

Title (en)

Method of mesuring and/or controlling in a fastening device including a hydropneumatic impulse screw driver

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Messen und/oder Ansteuern bei einer Schraubvorrichtung mit einem hydropneumatischen Impulsschrauber

Title (fr)

Procédé de mesure et/ou de commande d'un équipement de vissage comprenant une visseuse hydropneumatique à martèlement

Publication

EP 1000710 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402779 A

Priority

FR 9814353 A

Abstract (en)

Screw machine has a gear train (4), which applies a torque at the mouth of the screw machine (6) to an assembly that is to be tightened. A torque sensor (5) is connected to the gear train and measures the instantaneous torque. The measured signal comprises cycles representing the couples applied successively to the assembly. At least one torque maximum is detected in each cycle and when there is only one maximum in a cycle the screw machine is stopped.

Abstract (fr)

Cette visseuse comporte un arbre d'entraînement (4) qui, par un embout de vissage (6), peut appliquer un couple de serrage à des moyens de vissage par lesquels un assemblage doit être serré. Un capteur de couple (5) est associé à l'arbre d'entraînement (4) et délivre un signal de mesure représentant le couple instantané transmis par l'embout (6) sur les moyens de vissage. Le signal de mesure comprend des cycles, représentatifs de l'évolution du couple de serrage pendant les coups successifs appliqués par la visseuse (1) sur les moyens de vissage. Selon l'invention, le procédé de commande consiste à détecter au moins un maximum dans chacun des cycles du signal et à arrêter la visseuse (1) dès que le nombre de maximums dans un cycle est au plus égal à un. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25B 23/14; B25B 23/145

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 23/14 (2006.01); B25B 23/145 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 23/1453 (2013.01); B25B 23/1405 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1000710 A1 20000517; EP 1000710 B1 20060118; DE 69929510 D1 20060406; DE 69929510 T2 20060720; FR 2785986 A1 20000519; FR 2785986 B1 20001229

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160601

2016-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151108

2016-07-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20151108

2016-06-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69929510

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141119

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141119

- Year of fee payment: 16

2007-01-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20061019

2006-04-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69929510

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-04-06

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-03-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20060223

2006-01-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2006-01-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-01-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060118

2004-01-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031208

2002-08-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RENAULT S.A.S.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE GB IT

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001117

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI