Global Patent Index - EP 1000713 A1

EP 1000713 A1 2000-05-17 - Pocket tool

Title (en)

Pocket tool

Title (de)

Taschenwerkzeug

Title (fr)

Outil de poche

Publication

EP 1000713 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99122274 A

Priority

  • EP 99122274 A
  • EP 98121320 A
  • EP 98121315 A

Abstract (en)

The pocket tool includes at least one body element with a functional element movable out from the handle. The functional element can be turned out of the body element against the force of an elastic element (28) round a pivot (29). The elastic element lies against the stub (30) of the functional element, and these two act in a locking cam and recess combination in at least one end position.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein besonders handliches und bedienungsfreundliches, leichtes und doch solides Taschenwerkzeug. Ein derartiges Taschenwerkzeug mit einem länglichen, als Griff dienenden und einen Aufnahmebereich für wenigstens ein in eine Funktionsposition aus dem Griff herausführbares Funktionselement (1) aufweisenden Körperelement, wobei das wenigstens eine Funktionselement gegen die Kraft eines elastischen Elementes (28) um ein Schwenklager (29) aus dem Körperelement ausschwenkbar ist, soll dahingehend verbessert werden, daß das elastische Element am Talon (30) des Funktionselementes anliegt und beide in wenigstens einer Endposition in einer Rastnocken-/Rastsenkenkombination zusammenwirken. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26B 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63B 57/00 (2006.01); B26B 1/04 (2006.01); B26B 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26B 1/046 (2013.01); A63B 57/50 (2015.10); B26B 11/006 (2013.01); A63B 57/0037 (2013.01); A63B 57/207 (2015.10); A63B 57/353 (2015.10); A63B 2210/58 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1000713 A1 20000517; EP 1000713 B1 20060802

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170130

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161118

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161122

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2007-07-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070503

2007-03-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-10-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20061002

2006-09-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59913727 P 20060914

2006-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2006-08-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-07-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VICTORINOX AG

2006-06-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ELSENER, CARL

2006-06-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MUELLER, WALTER

2002-11-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021011

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001117

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI