Global patent index - EP 1000718 A2

EP 1000718 A2 2000-05-17 - Mixer for making a pumpable mortar

Title (en)

Mixer for making a pumpable mortar

Title (de)

Mischer zum Herstellen pumpfähiger Putzmassen

Title (fr)

Mélangeur pour l'obtention d'un enduit pompable

Publication

EP 1000718 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99120460 A

Priority

  • DE 19851077 A
  • DE 19913646 A

Abstract (en)

The mixer produces a mixture from dry material and added water. It includes a mixing tube (1) with a mixing screw (11) on a mixing shaft (12) ending in a carrier (13) for the screw conveyor (21) of a screw conveyor pump (2) fitted after the mixing tube. There is at least one baffle ring (16) in the wet region of the mixing tube. The ring is fixed to the mixing shaft.

Abstract (de)

Ein Mischer zum Herstellen pumpfähiger Putzmassen aus Trockenmasse und Anmachwasser umfaßt ein Mischrohr (1), das eine Mischwendel (11) auf einer Mischwelle (12) umschließt. Letztere endet in einem Mitnehmer (13) für die Schnecke (21) einer dem Mischrohr (1) nachgeordneten Schneckenpumpe (2). Eine verbesserte Homogenisierung der so erzeugten Putzmassen läßt sich dadurch erreichen, daß im Naßbereich des Mischrohres (1) mindestens ein Stauring (161) angeordnet ist. Letzterer ist vorzugsweise drehfest mit der Mischwelle (12) verbunden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28C 5/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01F 7/00 (2006.01); B01F 7/16 (2006.01); B28C 5/12 (2006.01); B28C 5/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B28C 5/1284 (2013.01); B01F 7/00708 (2013.01); B01F 7/00908 (2013.01); B01F 7/16 (2013.01); B28C 5/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1000718 A2 20000517; EP 1000718 A3 20020605

INPADOC legal status

2004-11-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040504

2004-02-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031222

2003-02-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20021128

2002-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-06-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 28C 5/16 A, 7B 28C 5/12 B, 7B 01F 7/16 B, 7B 01F 7/00 B

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI