Global Patent Index - EP 1000735 A2

EP 1000735 A2 2000-05-17 - Filling apparatus of axial powder presses

Title (en)

Filling apparatus of axial powder presses

Title (de)

Füllvorrichtung für axiale Pulverpressen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de remplissage dans des presses axiales pour poudre

Publication

EP 1000735 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99121951 A

Priority

DE 19851527 A

Abstract (en)

Filler shoe (15) is coupled to the feeding apparatus (12), especially to the filler main body. Filling device, especially for axial powder pressing, comprises a feeding apparatus (12), a filler shoe (15) and a powder feed (13, 14). The feeding apparatus can move back and forth on or over a filler plate. The shoe can be pressed onto the filler plate or a matrix (5) arranged in it. Filler shoe (15) is coupled to the feeding apparatus (12), especially to the filler main body.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf eine Füllvorrichtung für axiale Pulverpressen mit einer Fülleinrichtung (12), die eine Füllerantriebsplatte (17), einen insbesondere pressenseitig sitzenden Füllschuh (15) und eine Pulver-Zuführungseinrichtung (13, 14) aufweist. Die Fülleinrichtung (12) ist mittels eines Verstellantriebs (16) auf einer Füllerplatte (6) vor- und zurück verschiebbar und der Füllschuh (15) ist in einer Füllstellung auf die Füllerplatte (6) bzw. eine darin sitzende Matrizenoberfläche drückbar. Erfindungsgemäß ist der Füllschuh (15) an die Füllerantriebsplatte (12) nur lose angekoppelt. Dadurch kann der Füllschuh mit einer kontrollierten und gleichmäßigen Verstellkraft beaufschlagt werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B30B 15/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28B 13/02 (2006.01); B30B 15/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B28B 13/023 (2013.01); B30B 15/304 (2013.01); B22F 2998/00 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

B22F 2998/00 + B22F 3/004

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19851527 A1 20000511; AT 350211 T 20070115; DE 59914120 D1 20070215; EP 1000735 A2 20000517; EP 1000735 A3 20020327; EP 1000735 B1 20070103; US 6343715 B1 20020205

INPADOC legal status


2011-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101109

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101109

2011-08-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110801

2011-08-11 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59914120

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-07-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-07-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091202

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20091126

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-01-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20091120

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20091124

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091124

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-05-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: PATENTANWALT DIPL.-ING. (UNI.) WOLFGANG HEISEL;HAUPTSTRASSE 14;8280 KREUZLINGEN (CH)

2007-12-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20071005

2007-07-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWALT DIPL. ING. WOLFGANG HEISEL

2007-02-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59914120 P 20070215

2007-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2004-08-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DORST TECHNOLOGIES GMBH & CO. KG

2003-07-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030519

2002-12-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR IT LI

2002-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020920

2002-03-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI