Global Patent Index - EP 1000737 A1

EP 1000737 A1 2000-05-17 - Printing machine

Title (en)

Printing machine

Title (de)

Druckmaschine

Title (fr)

Machine d'impression

Publication

EP 1000737 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98121059 A

Priority

EP 98121059 A

Abstract (en)

The printer has a rotatably driven cylindrical casing (16) mounted directly in the printer housing at both ends with protruding axle stubs (18) and a shaft (22) passing through and rotating with the cylinder casing. The rotary drive is exerted on the shaft and the cylinder casing can be applied axially to a torque transfer element (28) seated on the shaft. The torque transfer element can form a frictional coupling with an axle stub.

Abstract (de)

Druckmaschine mit einer drehantreibbaren Zylinderhülse (16), die an beiden Enden mit vorspringenden Achsstummeln (18) direkt im Maschinengestell (10, 12) gelagert ist, und mit einer mitdrehbar durch die Zylinderhülse verlaufenden Welle (22), dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß der Drehantrieb über die Welle (22) erfolgt und die Zylinderhülse (16) axial gegen ein auf der Welle sitzendes Drehmomentübertragungsglied (28) anstellbar ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 13/08; B41F 13/004; B41F 13/008

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/00 (2006.01); B41F 13/20 (2006.01); B41F 31/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/0008 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1000737 A1 20000517; EP 1000737 B1 20020313; DE 59803357 D1 20020418; ES 2172079 T3 20020916; JP 2000141598 A 20000523; US 6267056 B1 20010731

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151014

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151124

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151103

- Year of fee payment: 18

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091106

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-08-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100730

2010-07-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20091106

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081021

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081029

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-03-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20021216

2002-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2172079

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-08-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-04-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59803357

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-04-18

2002-03-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010411

2001-01-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990514

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI