Global Patent Index - EP 1000740 A1

EP 1000740 A1 2000-05-17 - Cylinder cleaning apparatus

Title (en)

Cylinder cleaning apparatus

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Reinigen von Zylindern

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour nettoyer un cylindre.

Publication

EP 1000740 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99308637 A

Priority

JP 31256798 A

Abstract (en)

There is disclosed an apparatus for cleaning a plurality of cylinders each of which includes an outer surface. The apparatus comprises a cleaning unit (6) including a supply of cleaning fabric (16) installed thereon. The cleaning unit further includes a plurality of pressure pads (10;12) opposed to the outer surfaces of the cylinders respectively, at least one of the pressure pads being incorporated into the cleaning unit for reciprocatingly movement toward and away from the outer surface of the corresponding cylinder. A cleaning fabric is fed to the pressure pads from the supply of cleaning fabric (8). The apparatus further comprises actuating means for moving at least one of the pressure pads relatively to the cleaning unit so that the cleaning fabric is pressed against the outer surface of the corresponding cylinder and then released from being pressed by at least one of the pressure pads to clean the outer surface of the corresponding cylinder. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 35/00; B41F 35/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 35/00 (2006.01); B41F 35/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 35/006 (2013.01); B41F 35/00 (2013.01); B41F 35/06 (2013.01); B41P 2235/246 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[A] US 4981078 A 19910101 - DETTINGER DIETRICH [DE], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1000740 A1 20000517; CN 1256205 A 20000614

INPADOC legal status


2003-12-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030602

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000920

2000-08-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HARA, AKIRA

2000-08-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ONUMA, HIRAKU

2000-08-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KOMATSU, TOSHIMI

2000-08-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HARA, AKIRA

2000-08-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ONUMA, HIRAKU

2000-08-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KOMATSU, TOSHIMI

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI