Global Patent Index - EP 1000745 A2

EP 1000745 A2 2000-05-17 - Electro-thermal conversion device board, ink-jet recording head provided with the electro-thermal conversion device board, ink-jet recording apparatus using the same, and production method of ink-jet recording head

Title (en)

Electro-thermal conversion device board, ink-jet recording head provided with the electro-thermal conversion device board, ink-jet recording apparatus using the same, and production method of ink-jet recording head

Title (de)

Platine zur elektrothermischen Umwandlung, Tintenstrahldruckkopf und Tintenstrahlaufzeichnungsgerät mit derselben, und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Tintenstrahldruckkopfes

Title (fr)

Plaquette de dispositif de conversion électrothermique, tête d'enregistrement à jet d'encre pourvue de la plaquette de conversion électro-thermique, appareil d'enregistrement à jet d'encre l'utilisant aussi et méthode de production d'une tête d'enregistrement à jet d'encre

Publication

EP 1000745 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99121304 A

Priority

  • JP 32287898 A
  • JP 32287998 A
  • JP 32288098 A
  • JP 31105098 A

Abstract (en)

Beneath electro-thermal conversion device layers (121) having heaters (122 and 132), a common electrode layer (134) electrically connected to heaters (122 and 132) through branch connection parts (134A) is laminated through a protective film (126), and discrete electrodes (124 and 136) are formed on an upper surface of the electro-thermal conversion device layers (121) putting the branch connection parts (134A) between, respectively. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/14; B41J 2/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/14 (2006.01); B41J 2/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/14072 (2013.01); B41J 2/14056 (2013.01); B41J 2/14129 (2013.01); B41J 2/1601 (2013.01); B41J 2/1628 (2013.01); B41J 2/1631 (2013.01); B41J 2/1642 (2013.01); B41J 2/1646 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1000745 A2 20000517; EP 1000745 A3 20010124; US 6443563 B1 20020903

INPADOC legal status


2008-02-27 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080116

2007-08-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070718

2001-10-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT NL

2001-08-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010607

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI