Global Patent Index - EP 1000759 A3

EP 1000759 A3 2000-11-02 - Device for printing an endless foil having no marks

Title (en)

Device for printing an endless foil having no marks

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Bedrucken einer markierungsfreien Endlosfolie

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'impression d'une bande sans fin sans repère

Publication

EP 1000759 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99121278 A

Priority

DE 19850274 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1000759A2] Device has transmission device (5) arranged at output of buffer arrangement (6,11) to determine lengths of paths of onward transport of endless sheet (1). Average speed of onward transport of sheet is determined and used to set speed for the transport of sheet through print unit (2). Sensor (3) detects position of roller (6).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 11/42; B41J 15/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 11/42 (2006.01); B41J 15/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 11/42 (2013.01); B41J 15/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1000759 A2 20000517; EP 1000759 A3 20001102; EP 1000759 B1 20051214; AT 312719 T 20051215; BR 9905335 A 20000926; CA 2287754 A1 20000430; CA 2287754 C 20040210; DE 19850274 C1 20000525; DE 59912923 D1 20060119; DK 1000759 T3 20060418; ES 2252904 T3 20060516; HU 218886 B 20001228; HU 9903756 A1 20000528; HU 9903756 D0 19991228; US 6564710 B1 20030520

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161031

2016-02-29 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20151012

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151020

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20151012

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-07 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59912923

- Representative's name: PETERREINS SCHLEY PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, DE

2015-08-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150501

2015-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141031

2015-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141025

2015-07-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141025

2015-07-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20150630

2015-06-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141025

2015-05-20 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150501

2014-05-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121026

2014-02-28 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20131028

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-02-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20131028

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-02-07 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140207

2014-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131028

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20131029

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-12-27 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCHINEN AG, DE

- Effective date: 20131127

2013-12-27 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCHINEN AG, DE

- Effective date: 20131127

2013-11-07 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCHINEN AG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: CSAT GESELLSCHAFT FUER COMPUTER-SYSTEME UND AUTOMATIONS-TECHNIK MBH, 76344 EGGENSTEIN-LEOPOLDSHAFEN, DE

- Document: DE 59912923

- Effective date: 20130916

2013-11-07 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59912923

- Representative's name: KLOCKMANN, NILS, DIPL.-PHYS., DE

- Effective date: 20130306

2013-11-07 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59912923

- Representative's name: KLOCKMANN, NILS, DIPL.-PHYS., DE

- Effective date: 20130916

2013-11-07 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59912923

- Representative's name: PETERREINS SCHLEY PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20130916

2013-11-07 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59912923

- Representative's name: PETERREINS SCHLEY PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20130306

2013-10-31 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCHINEN A.G.

- Effective date: 20131008

2013-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121031

2013-10-23 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20130926 AND 20131002

2013-09-18 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20130913

2013-09-18 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20130913

2013-09-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59912923

- Representative's name: KLOCKMANN, NILS, DIPL.-PHYS., DE

2013-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121025

2013-08-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCHINEN AG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: CSAT GESELLSCHAFT FUER COMPUTER-SYSTEME UND AUTOMATIONS-TECHNIK MIT BESCHRAENKTER HAFTUNG, DE

2013-07-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121025

2013-07-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121026

2013-07-17 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2013-06-03 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2013-03-06 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59912923

- Representative's name: KLOCKMANN, NILS, DIPL.-PHYS., DE

2012-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20111021

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20111024

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-01-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20111020

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20111024

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101029

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051214

2008-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061025

2008-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061025

2006-11-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060915

2006-10-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-07-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2252904 T3

2006-05-15 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060515

2006-04-18 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2006-04-04 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-03-14 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060314

2006-02-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060118

2006-01-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: RIEDERER HASLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2006-01-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59912923 P 20060119

2006-01-11 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-12-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-12-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-12-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051214

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010307

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 41J 11/42 A, 7B 41J 15/04 B

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI