Global Patent Index - EP 1000767 A1

EP 1000767 A1 2000-05-17 - Recording materials for ink jet printing

Title (en)

Recording materials for ink jet printing

Title (de)

Aufzeichnungsmaterialien für den Tintenstrahldruck

Title (fr)

Matériaux d'enregistrement par jet d'encre

Publication

EP 1000767 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98811095 A

Priority

EP 98811095 A

Abstract (en)

A recording material for ink jet printing, with ink pick-up layer(s) and an absorption layer for fixing the ink, in which the absorption layer contains one or more binders and an aluminum oxide-hydroxide (AlOOH) with 0.04-4.2 mol% rare earth element(s) (atomic numbers 57-71), based on Al2O3. An Independent claim is also included for an ink jet recording material with an absorption layer as above, in which the binder in the ink pick-up layer is a mixture of gelatin, methyl-hydroxypropyl-cellulose and poly-(2-ethyl-oxazoline).

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Aufzeichnungsmaterial für den Tintenstrahldruck beschrieben, das unter einer oder mehreren Tintenaufnahmeschichten mindestens eine Absorptionsschicht zur Fixierung der Tintenflüssigkeit aufweist, worin die Absorptionsschicht ein Aluminiumoxid-hydroxid mit 0.04 bis 4.2 Molprozent eines oder mehrerer Elemente der Gruppe der Seltenen Erden (Ordnungszahlen 57 bis 71 des Periodischen Systems der Elemente) bezogen auf Al2O3 enthält, vorzugsweise in einer Menge von 50 bis 95 Gewichtsprozent bezogen auf die Gesamtmenge des Aluminiumoxid-hydroxids und des Bindemittels.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41M 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/52 (2006.01); B41M 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41M 5/506 (2013.01); B41M 5/52 (2013.01); B41M 5/5236 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] EP 0761459 A1 19970312 - ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 097, no. 011 28 November 1997 (1997-11-28)
  • [A] S.ENGELS ET AL: "Zur Modifizierung hochreaktiver Aluminiumoxidübergangsformen", Z. ANORG. ALLG. CHEM., vol. 621, 1995, pages 381 - 387, XP002096550

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1000767 A1 20000517; EP 1000767 B1 20010829; DE 59801336 D1 20011004

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071130

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131103

2014-08-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-08-28 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59801336

- Effective date: 20140603

2014-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131130

2014-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131130

2014-07-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131103

2014-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121120

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20121122

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20121121

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-09-15 [REG CH PVP] PLEDGING

2011-03-31 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20091201

2010-10-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-10-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100601

2010-06-23 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100601

2010-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ILFORD IMAGING SWITZERLAND G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081020

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-04-30 [PGRI IT] POSTGRANT: PATENT REINSTATED IN CONTRACTING STATE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Effective date: 20091201

2009-08-21 [REG FR D5] RENUNCIATION DUE TO AN APPEAL ON RESTAURATION

2009-06-26 [REG FR RN] APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081013

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20081128

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-01-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20081017

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-11-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081020

2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021130

2005-11-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051103

2005-04-29 [REG FR ERR] CORRECTION

- Free text: BOPI DE PUBLICATION Nø: 02/04 PAGES: 246 PARTIE DU BULLETIN CONCERNEE: BREVETS EUROPEENS DONT LA TRADUCTION N'A PAS ETE REMISE A I'INPI IL Y A LIEU DE SUPPRIMER: LA MENTION DE LA NON REMISE. LA REMISE DE LA TRADUCTION EST PUBLIEE DANS LE PRESENT BOPI.

2005-04-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-08-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-25 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011117

2001-10-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59801336 20011004

2001-09-26 [111Z] REGISTERING OF LICENCES OR OTHER RIGHTS

- Free text: 20010703 BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2001-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-08-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2001-01-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990510

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI