Global patent index - EP 1000768 A3

EP 1000768 A3 2001-02-21 - Production of lithographic printing plate support

Title (en)

Production of lithographic printing plate support

Title (de)

Herstellung eines Trägers einer Flachdruckplatte

Title (fr)

Fabrication d'un support pour plaque lithographique

Publication

EP 1000768 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99203681 A

Priority

GB 9825822 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1000768A2] A process is provided for the manufacture of a support for a lithographic printing plate precursor, the process comprising graining at least one surface of a metallic substrate, applying an anodic layer to at least one grained surface of the substrate, and treating at least one grained and anodised surface of the substrate with an aqueous solution comprising a copolymer of acrylic acid and vinylphosphonic acid whilst applying a constant voltage or constant current. A method is also disclosed for the manufacture of lithographic printing plate precursors which provide plates showing good resistance to abrasion, corrosion, staining and scumming, both on development and on press. Additionally, the plates display excellent coating adhesion in image areas, together with very good exposure latitude and solvent resistance.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41N 3/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03F 7/09 (2006.01); B41N 3/03 (2006.01); C25D 11/16 (2006.01); C25D 11/20 (2006.01); G03F 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41N 3/038 (2013.01); B41N 3/036 (2013.01); C25D 11/16 (2013.01); C25D 11/20 (2013.01); B41N 3/03 (2013.01); B41N 3/034 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1000768 A2 20000517; EP 1000768 A3 20010221; EP 1000768 B1 20040303; DE 69915211 D1 20040408; DE 69915211 T2 20050113; GB 9825822 D0 19990120; JP 2000141938 A 20000523

INPADOC legal status

2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120601

2012-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111130

2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111103

2012-09-13 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69915211

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120601

2012-08-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20120731

2012-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20111103

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101012

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101007

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101019

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-12-12 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2007-04-04 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2005-02-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041206

2004-11-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-08-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2004-04-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69915211

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-04-08

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2004-03-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-03-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040303

2004-03-03 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040303

2002-02-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AGFA-GEVAERT

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT NL

2001-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010821

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI