Global Patent Index - EP 1000769 A1

EP 1000769 A1 2000-05-17 - Paper leaflet, package comprising a case with such a leaflet, assembly formed of the package and its contents, method of producing the leaflet

Title (en)

Paper leaflet, package comprising a case with such a leaflet, assembly formed of the package and its contents, method of producing the leaflet

Title (de)

Beipackzettel aus Papier, Verpackung bestehend aus einem Etui mit einem solchen Beipackzettel, Anordnung bestehend aus der Verpackung und seinem Inhalt, Verfahren zur Herstellung des Beipackzettels

Title (fr)

Notice en papier, emballage comprenant un étui uncluant une telle notice, ensemble formé dudit emballage et d'un contenu, procédé de réalisation de ladite notice

Publication

EP 1000769 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402318 A

Priority

FR 9813808 A

Abstract (en)

A new leaflet (1) for technical instructions (5) made of paper or analog comprising at least two flat thin superimposed sheets (3,4) attached on one side comprises a longitudinal attenuation (25) on at least one sheet allow to tear the sheet manually (the attenuation being increased at the extremities (26)). A new leaflet (1) for technical instructions (5) made of paper or analog comprising at least two flat thin superimposed sheets (3,4) attached on one side comprises a longitudinal attenuation (25) on at least one sheet allow to tear the sheet manually (the attenuation being increased at the extremities (26). The leaflet (1) may be fold and used in packaging (2), especially box, of pharmaceutical product (22). Independent claim is also included for: (1) a packaging product comprising a box or case (24) comprising the leaflet (1) inside; (2) an assembly comprising the packaging product with the contents in the box or case; and (3) the manufacturing of the leaflet

Abstract (fr)

L'invention se rapporte à une notice (1) pour produits pharmaceutiques ou équivalents comprenant au moins deux feuilles (12,16) superposées solidarisées sur un de leur bord, la notice comprenant au moins une ligne d'affaiblissement permettant de séparer la notice originellement unitaire en au moins deux parties distinctes. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B42D 15/00; B42D 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42D 5/00 (2006.01); B42D 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B42D 5/00 (2013.01); B42D 15/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2785228 A1 20000505; FR 2785228 B1 20001208; AT 232798 T 20030315; CA 2287144 A1 20000503; DE 1000769 T1 20001102; DE 69905440 D1 20030327; DE 69905440 T2 20031127; EP 1000769 A1 20000517; EP 1000769 B1 20030219; ES 2193674 T3 20031101; US 6419275 B1 20020716

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080923

2010-06-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080922

2010-01-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080923

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080922

2009-11-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080923

2009-10-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080930

2009-10-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080930

2009-10-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080930

2009-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080922

2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090401

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080922

2009-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080930

2009-07-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080922

2009-07-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090529

2009-06-24 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2009-06-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090401

2009-05-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090401

2009-05-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080922

2009-04-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080930

2009-04-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-03-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ORGANON N.V.

- Effective date: 20080930

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071026

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20071120

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-02-29 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2008-02-29 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2008-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20071024

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070928

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20071001

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070903

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20070905

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070919

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-11-24 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070912

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-11-24 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20070913

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-09-20 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070920

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-09-13 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20070913

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-08-28 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20070828

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-02-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031120

2003-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2193674 T3

2003-09-22 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030922

2003-06-03 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-05-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: RIEDERER HASLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2003-05-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030501

2003-05-19 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030519

2003-05-19 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030519

2003-03-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69905440 P 20030327

2003-03-19 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2003-02-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-02-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-02-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-02-19 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030219

2003-02-19 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030219

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

2000-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000526

2000-07-05 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI