Global Patent Index - EP 1000770 A2

EP 1000770 A2 2000-05-17 - Filing case

Title (en)

Filing case

Title (de)

Ordner

Title (fr)

Classeur

Publication

EP 1000770 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99201320 A

Priority

  • JP 32116398 A
  • JP 33180098 A

Abstract (en)

There is provided a plastic filing case 1 which comprises: a main body 4 having a volume sufficient to contain a multiplicity of folders 2 and including a rectangular bottom plate 7 and side plates 8, 8, 9, 10; a cover 6 for covering the main body 4; a hinge member formed integrally with the main body 4 and the cover 6 for connection to the cover 6 and the main body 4; and at least one set of engagement elements 3 each having an arcuate top edge and a proximal edge portion extending therefrom perpendicularly to the bottom plate 7, and provided on an interior surface of the bottom plate 7 at a predetermined interval alongside of at least one of four edges of the bottom plate 7 to project upright from the interior surface of the bottom plate 7 and to be perpendicular to the one edge of the bottom plate 7; the engagement elements 3 being engageable with engagement portions 25 which are formed at a predetermined interval in an edge portion of a folder 2 for retaining therein a document and the like, each engagement portion 25 having an incision. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B42F 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42F 3/00 (2006.01); B42F 13/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B42F 13/16 (2013.01); B42F 3/006 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE DK ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1000770 A2 20000517; EP 1000770 A3 20010131

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030721

2003-04-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030311

2001-10-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE DE DK ES FR GB IT NL

2001-07-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010516

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 42F 3/04 A, 7B 42F 7/14 B, 7B 42F 13/00 B, 7B 42F 3/00 B

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FR GB IT NL

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI