Global Patent Index - EP 1000770 A3

EP 1000770 A3 2001-01-31 - Filing case

Title (en)

Filing case

Title (de)

Ordner

Title (fr)

Classeur

Publication

EP 1000770 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99201320 A

Priority

  • JP 32116398 A
  • JP 33180098 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1000770A2] There is provided a plastic filing case 1 which comprises: a main body 4 having a volume sufficient to contain a multiplicity of folders 2 and including a rectangular bottom plate 7 and side plates 8, 8, 9, 10; a cover 6 for covering the main body 4; a hinge member formed integrally with the main body 4 and the cover 6 for connection to the cover 6 and the main body 4; and at least one set of engagement elements 3 each having an arcuate top edge and a proximal edge portion extending therefrom perpendicularly to the bottom plate 7, and provided on an interior surface of the bottom plate 7 at a predetermined interval alongside of at least one of four edges of the bottom plate 7 to project upright from the interior surface of the bottom plate 7 and to be perpendicular to the one edge of the bottom plate 7; the engagement elements 3 being engageable with engagement portions 25 which are formed at a predetermined interval in an edge portion of a folder 2 for retaining therein a document and the like, each engagement portion 25 having an incision. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B42F 3/04; B42F 3/00; B42F 7/14; B42F 13/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42F 3/00 (2006.01); B42F 13/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B42F 13/16 (2013.01); B42F 3/006 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1000770 A2 20000517; EP 1000770 A3 20010131

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030721

2003-04-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030311

2001-10-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE DK ES FR GB IT NL

2001-07-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010516

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 42F 3/04 A, 7B 42F 7/14 B, 7B 42F 13/00 B, 7B 42F 3/00 B

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FR GB IT NL

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI