Global Patent Index - EP 1000809 A1

EP 1000809 A1 2000-05-17 - Motor vehicle emblem

Title (en)

Motor vehicle emblem

Title (de)

Kraftfahrzeugemblem

Title (fr)

Emblème pour véhicule automobile

Publication

EP 1000809 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99122005 A

Priority

DE 29820304 U

Abstract (en)

The emblem plate (2) is in the form of a template possessing an electrically luminescent sheet (5) or a sheet partially covering a full-surfaced sheet (6). The sheets have electric connections (7,8) connected to a power supply by a circuit. The electro-luminescent sheets are activated by the vehicle's ignition and are clamped between the template and the base plate or and between the base plate (1) and holder-ring (4).

Abstract (de)

Ein Emblem zur Anordnung im Bereich des Lenkrades oder Armaturenbrettes eines Kraftfahrzeuges ist im wesentlichen flächig ausgebildet und umfaßt eine Basisplakette (1), eine Zeichenplakette (2), Befestigungsmittel (3) und einen Haltering (4). Die Zeichenplakette ist als Schablone (2) ausgebildet, die entweder mit einer aufgebrachten Elektrolumineszenzfolie (5) versehen ist oder die eine vollflächige Elektrolumineszenzfolie (6) partiell abdeckt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60R 13/00; G09F 13/22; H05B 33/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 13/22 (2006.01); B60R 13/00 (2006.01); G09F 7/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 7/18 (2013.01); G09F 2013/227 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29820304 U1 19990107; EP 1000809 A1 20000517; JP 2000159033 A 20000613

INPADOC legal status


2003-06-11 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021128

2002-08-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020717

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-11-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000921

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI