Global Patent Index - EP 1000831 A1

EP 1000831 A1 2000-05-17 - Rotatable seat with improved movement, especially for a railway vehicle

Title (en)

Rotatable seat with improved movement, especially for a railway vehicle

Title (de)

Drehbarer Sitz mit verbesserter Bewegung, insbesondere für ein Schienenfahrzeug

Title (fr)

Siège tournant à mouvement perfectionné, notamment pour véhicule ferroviaire

Publication

EP 1000831 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402428 A

Priority

FR 9814289 A

Abstract (en)

The reversible seat has a moving upper section, a fixed base (16) and a turning mechanism (28) comprising a carriage (30) which is fixed to the upper section and is able to move horizontally in a guide (32) and rotate about a vertical axis (Z). The carriage has a drive (52) to move it and a gear mechanism that converts the carriage's horizontal movement into a rotary movement.

Abstract (fr)

Ce siège comprend une partie supérieure mobile (14) de réception d'au moins un occupant portée par une partie inférieure fixe formant piétement (16) et des moyens (28) de retournement de la partie supérieure (14) d'avant en arrière et réciproquement. Ces moyens de retournement (28) comprennent un chariot (30), solidaire de la partie supérieure (14), monté déplaçable en rotation autour d'un axe (Z) sensiblement vertical, lié à ce chariot, et en translation sensiblement perpendiculairement à cet axe de rotation (Z) dans un guide rectiligne (32) porté par le piétement (16). Les moyens de retournement (28) comprennent également des moyens (52) d'entraînement en translation du chariot (30) et des moyens (54) à engrenage de transformation du mouvement de translation du chariot (30) en mouvement de rotation de ce chariot (30). <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61D 33/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 3/18 (2006.01); B61D 33/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61D 33/0085 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1000831 A1 20000517; EP 1000831 B1 20041222; CA 2284448 A1 20000513; CA 2284448 C 20060801; DE 69922768 D1 20050127; DE 69922768 T2 20051208; ES 2238096 T3 20050816; FR 2785780 A1 20000519; FR 2785780 B1 20010119; JP 2000139608 A 20000523; JP 3853546 B2 20061206; US 6332648 B1 20011225

INPADOC legal status


2010-01-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081006

2009-12-30 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20081006

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081004

2009-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081031

2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090501

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081004

2009-06-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081004

2009-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ALSTOM HOLDINGS

- Effective date: 20081031

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071023

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20071123

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071024

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071025

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20071030

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-12-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050923

2005-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2238096 T3

2005-04-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050321

2005-01-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69922768 P 20050127

2004-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT

2004-12-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-07-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030623

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE ES GB IT

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000831

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI