Global Patent Index - EP 1000832 A1

EP 1000832 A1 2000-05-17 - Rotatable seat, especially for a railway vehicle

Title (en)

Rotatable seat, especially for a railway vehicle

Title (de)

Drehbarer Sitz, insbesondere für ein Schienenfahrzeug

Title (fr)

Siège tournant, notamment pour véhicule ferroviaire

Publication

EP 1000832 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402650 A

Priority

FR 9814291 A

Abstract (en)

The seat has a mobile upper section (14) mounted on a fixed base (16) and has a turning mechanism (28) that allows its position to be reversed. The turning mechanism comprises a vertical pivot (30) connecting the upper section to the base, a slider (36) which acts as a bearing and can rotate about the pivot or move perpendicular to its axis (Z), and two cams (46, 48) on the base and upper section respectively. One of the cams has a profile which causes the upper section to follow a given trajectory as it rotates.

Abstract (fr)

Ce siège comprend une partie supérieure mobile (14) de réception d'au moins un occupant portée par une partie inférieure fixe formant piétement (16) et des moyens (28) de retournement de la partie supérieure (14) d'avant en arrière et réciproquement. Ces moyens de retournement (28) comprennent un pivot (30) reliant la partie supérieure (14) et le piétement (16). L'axe (Z) de ce pivot est sensiblement vertical et lié au piétement (16). Les moyens de retournement (28) comprennent également un coulisseau (36) monté déplaçable, sur la partie supérieure (14), en rotation autour du pivot (30) et en translation sensiblement perpendiculairement à l'axe (Z), et deux cames complémentaires (46,48) portées respectivement par le piétement (16) et la partie supérieure (14). Une des cames comporte un profil évolutif imposant à la partie supérieure (14) un trajet de retournement prédéterminé. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61D 33/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60N 2/14 (2006.01); A47C 3/18 (2006.01); B61D 33/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61D 33/0085 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1000832 A1 20000517; EP 1000832 B1 20060201; CA 2289718 A1 20000513; CA 2289718 C 20030930; DE 69929668 D1 20060413; DE 69929668 T2 20061026; ES 2258317 T3 20060816; FR 2785862 A1 20000519; FR 2785862 B1 20030516; JP 2000190844 A 20000711; JP 3472515 B2 20031202; US 6302483 B1 20011016

INPADOC legal status


2010-01-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081027

2009-12-30 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20081027

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081025

2009-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081031

2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090501

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081025

2009-06-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081025

2009-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: ALSTOM HOLDINGS

- Effective date: 20081031

2008-04-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20071123

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071023

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20071123

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071024

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071025

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20071030

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-01-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061103

2006-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2258317 T3

2006-06-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060512

2006-04-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69929668 P 20060413

2006-02-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT

2006-02-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-02-01 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060201

2006-01-04 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM HOLDINGS

2003-08-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030710

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE ES GB IT

2000-11-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000831

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI