Global Patent Index - EP 1000859 A1

EP 1000859 A1 2000-05-17 - Air feeding device for a vertical tubular bag making machine, and method

Title (en)

Air feeding device for a vertical tubular bag making machine, and method

Title (de)

Luftzuführvorrichtung für eine vertikale Schlauchbeutelherstellungssmaschine, und Verfahren

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'alimentation d'air pour une machine verticale de fabrication de sachets tubulaires et procédé

Publication

EP 1000859 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99113754 A

Priority

DE 19852107 A

Abstract (en)

The arrangement has a vertical fill tube (2), a funnel (6) above the tube, a shaping tube (8) concentrically enclosing the fill tube to form an annular gap between them, a fan (10) for blowing air into the fill tube via a connecting tube (11) and for influencing the falling product in the tube and a suction device (12) for sucking the air out of the fill tube. An air flap (13) within the tube is actuated by a drive (14) connected to a controller (15). An Independent claim is also included for a method of operating an air delivery arrangement for a vertical tubular bag production machine

Abstract (de)

Um ein in einem Füllrohr (2) fallendes, schüttfähiges Produkt (4) zusätzlich zu beschleunigen oder den Partikelschwarm des Produkts (4) zu komprimieren, wird vorgeschlagen taktweise Luft in das Füllrohr (2) zu blasen. Dazu wird eine Luftklappe (13) in einem Rohr (11) zwischen einem Gebläse (10) und dem Füllrohr (2) mittels eines Antriebs 14 betätigt. Eine Steuereinrichtung (15) steuert den Antrieb (14) in Abhängigkeit eines Verpackungsparameters, z. B. dem Zeitpunkt, in dem sich das Produkt (4) in einer von einem Sensor (16) erkannten Position des freien Falls befindet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 9/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 9/20 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 39/04 (2013.01); B65B 9/20 (2013.01); B65B 1/26 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1000859 A1 20000517; AU 5138699 A 20000518; AU 763800 B2 20030731; DE 19852107 A1 20000518; US 6179015 B1 20010130

INPADOC legal status


2003-12-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030510

2003-01-08 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: AIR FEEDING DEVICE FOR A VERTICAL TUBULAR BAG MAKING MACHINE

2002-03-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020121

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990802

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI