Global Patent Index - EP 1000863 A1

EP 1000863 A1 2000-05-17 - Packaging machine with maintenance device for gluing nozzles

Title (en)

Packaging machine with maintenance device for gluing nozzles

Title (de)

Verpackungsmaschine mit Wartungsaggregat für Leimdüse

Title (fr)

Machine d'emballage avec dispositif d'entretien des têtes de collage

Publication

EP 1000863 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99121020 A

Priority

DE 19851775 A

Abstract (en)

The packing machine has glue jets (14) to apply glue to the packs (10). The jets can be moved to the servicing position by a turning arm (18). In this position, the jets are alternately located over a catching container (24) for portions of glue, and a water container (25). The water container has a rotating roller (22) of elastic foam material serving as a cleaning and closing unit for the glue jets.

Abstract (de)

Zur Übertragung von Leim auf Packungen (10) dienen Leimdüsen (14). Diese sind durch einen Schwenkarm (18) in eine Wartungsposition bewegbar, in der sich die Leimdüse (14) alternativ oberhalb eines Auffangbehälters (24) für Leimportionen oder eines Wasserbehälters (25) befindet. Dem Wasserbehälter (25) ist eine drehbare Rolle (22) aus elastischem Werkstoff, insbesondere Schaumstoff, zugeordnet, die die Funktion eines Reinigungs- und Verschlussorgans für die Leimdüse (14) übernimmt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 51/02; B05B 15/02; B05C 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 15/02 (2006.01); B05C 5/02 (2006.01); B65B 51/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05C 5/02 (2013.01); B05B 15/0208 (2013.01); B65B 51/023 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19851775 A1 20000511; BR 9905316 A 20000912; CN 1128739 C 20031126; CN 1253101 A 20000517; DE 59908710 D1 20040408; EP 1000863 A1 20000517; EP 1000863 B1 20040303; JP 2000142632 A 20000523; JP 3556870 B2 20040825; US 2002170267 A1 20021121; US 6463716 B1 20021015

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20161025

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20161019

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20161013

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151102

2016-07-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20160630

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-08-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150501

2015-05-20 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20150501

2015-01-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20141008

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-02-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131010

- Year of fee payment: 15

2005-02-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041206

2005-01-03 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: FOCKE & CO. (GMBH & CO. KG)

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT2

2004-12-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-11-10 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: FOCKE & CO. (GMBH & CO. KG)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2004-05-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040408

2004-04-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: R. A. EGLI & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2004-04-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59908710

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-04-08

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2004-03-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-01-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20001218

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001005

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI