Global patent index - EP 1000865 A1

EP 1000865 A1 2000-05-17 - Crate made of plastic, provided with at least one handle

Title (en)

Crate made of plastic, provided with at least one handle

Title (de)

Kunststoffkasten mit zumindest einem Handgriff

Title (fr)

Casier en plastique avec au moins une poignée

Publication

EP 1000865 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99203373 A

Priority

BE 9800757 A

Abstract (en)

Crate made of plastic, in particular a bottle crate, which is provided with at least one handle (9), characterised in that the surface of the part of the handle (9) where the hand is to be placed when picking up the crate is at least partially formed of a layer (7) made of a plastomer. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 1/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 19/18 (2006.01); B65D 1/24 (2006.01); B65D 5/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 1/243 (2013.01); B65D 2501/24019 (2013.01); B65D 2501/2421 (2013.01); B65D 2501/24261 (2013.01); B65D 2501/24522 (2013.01); B65D 2501/24528 (2013.01); B65D 2501/24777 (2013.01); B65D 2501/24808 (2013.01); B65D 2525/289 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1000865 A1 20000517; BE 1012244 A3 20000801; CZ 294834 B6 20050316; CZ 9903714 A3 20011114; PL 197152 B1 20080331; PL 336182 A1 20000425; SK 144299 A3 20000612

INPADOC legal status

2005-03-23 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20041016

2003-06-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030506

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001110

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI