Global Patent Index - EP 1000869 A1

EP 1000869 A1 2000-05-17 - Articulated assembly using a hinge with biasing means for opening and closing

Title (en)

Articulated assembly using a hinge with biasing means for opening and closing

Title (de)

Gelenkeinheit mit einem Scharnier mit Öffnungs/Schliessunterstützung

Title (fr)

Ensemble articulé au moyen d'une charnière à ouverture/fermeture assistée

Publication

EP 1000869 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402568 A

Priority

FR 9814354 A

Abstract (en)

The assembly consists of hinged sections, with a film of material stuck to at least part of the surface of each section and having a connecting strip able to occupy an intermediate position where it intersects the geometrical axis of the hinge and is subjected to a maximum tension when the assembly is opened and closed. The assembly consists of hinged first (2) and second (3) sections, with a film of material (20) stuck to at least part of the surface of each section and having a connecting strip (23) able to occupy an intermediate position where it intersects the geometrical axis (A) of the hinge and is subjected to a maximum tension when the assembly is opened and closed. Once the connecting strip has passed the intermediate position the film urges the two sections towards their fully open or fully closed positions, depending on the direction of movement.

Abstract (fr)

La présente demande concerne un ensemble comportant une première partie (2), et une seconde partie (3) articulée sur la première, une feuille (20) étant collée sur au moins une portion de surface de chacune desdites première (2) et seconde (3) parties, ladite feuille comportant au moins une bande de liaison (23), apte, à l'ouverture et à la fermeture de l'ensemble (1), à occuper une position intermédiaire, dans laquelle elle coupe un axe géométrique (A) d'articulation de l'ensemble, en étant soumise à une tension maximale, et, après franchissement de ladite position intermédiaire, selon un mouvement relatif desdites première et seconde parties, dans une première direction, à rappeler élastiquement la seconde partie (3), en position fermée ou sensiblement fermée, et après franchissement de ladite position intermédiaire, dans une direction opposée à la première, à rappeler élastiquement la seconde partie (3), en position ouverte. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 47/08; A45C 13/34; B65D 43/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45C 13/34 (2006.01); B65D 6/18 (2006.01); B65D 6/20 (2006.01); B65D 47/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45C 13/345 (2013.01); B65D 47/0814 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1000869 A1 20000517; FR 2785877 A1 20000519; FR 2785877 B1 20010112; US 6474493 B1 20021105

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-16 [R18D] EP-APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN: (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20040629

2005-01-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040619

2002-07-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020618

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001117

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI