Global Patent Index - EP 1000870 A1

EP 1000870 A1 2000-05-17 - Container with contents retaining member

Title (en)

Container with contents retaining member

Title (de)

Behälter mit Vorrichtung zum Rückhalten seines Inhalts

Title (fr)

Récipient avec dispositif de confinement de son contenu

Publication

EP 1000870 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99308645 A

Priority

US 18396398 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention is directed to containers (10) with a retaining member (30) disposed within the container which substantially obstructs the opening of the container. Said member enlarges to receive a dispensing instrument (20) that is used to cap the container, and closes after removal of the dispensing instrument.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 47/20; B01L 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45D 34/00 (2006.01); A61J 7/00 (2006.01); B01L 3/02 (2006.01); B65D 41/04 (2006.01); B65D 47/20 (2006.01); B65D 83/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 47/2037 (2013.01); B01L 3/0282 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1000870 A1 20000517; AU 5608799 A 20000504; BR 9905339 A 20000905; CA 2287764 A1 20000502; CN 1253107 A 20000517; JP 2000177761 A 20000627; US 2001042572 A1 20011122; US H2044 H 20020903; US H2101 H 20040504; ZA 9906847 B 20010502

INPADOC legal status


2003-03-12 [R18W] WITHDRAWAL (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20030109

2003-03-05 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030113

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR GB

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001115

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI