Global Patent Index - EP 1000871 A1

EP 1000871 A1 2000-05-17 - Venting valve

Title (en)

Venting valve

Title (de)

Ent- und Begasungsventil

Title (fr)

Event

Publication

EP 1000871 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99121963 A

Priority

DE 29820270 U

Abstract (en)

The valve closure for containers has a closed-pore foam plug (4) in the valve sleeve (3). The plug (4) is of plastics, and pref. a radiation cross linked semi-hard particle foam of polyethylene or ethylene copolymer. It is compressed on insertion, so that the cut foam cells of the plug form a labyrinth at the inner side of the valve sleeve (3).

Abstract (de)

Mit der Erfindung wird ein Ent- und Begasungsventil im Verschluß der Füll- und Entleerungsöffnung eines Behälters für insbesondere gefährliche Flüssigkeiten zur Verfügung gestellt, dessen Verschluß-Oberboden 1 eine Öffnung 2 und vor dieser auf der Innenseite des Verschluß-Oberbodens 1 eine Ventilhülse 3 aufweist. Das Ventil ist so ausgebildet, daß in die Ventilhülse 3 ein geschlossen-poriger Schaumstoff-Stopfen 4 aus Kunststoff, vorzugsweise strahlenvernetzter, halbharter Partikel-Schaumstoff aus Polyethylen oder aus Ethylen-Co-Polymer, mit Vorspannung eingepreßt ist, so daß durch das Anliegen der angeschnittenen Zellen des Schaumstoff-Stopfens an der Innenseite der Ventilhülse 3 ein Labyrinth entsteht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 51/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 51/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 51/1616 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29820270 U1 19990114; EP 1000871 A1 20000517; EP 1000871 B1 20021002

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080603

2006-11-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061129

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-09-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030703

2002-11-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902915 20021107

2002-10-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE

2001-11-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010928

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001110

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI