Global Patent Index - EP 1000872 A1

EP 1000872 A1 2000-05-17 - Dispenser for hygienic articles

Title (en)

Dispenser for hygienic articles

Title (de)

Spender für Hygieneartikeln

Title (fr)

Distributeur pour articles d'hygiène

Publication

EP 1000872 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99122488 A

Priority

DE 19852297 A

Abstract (en)

The dispenser for cotton wool pads (30) has a bag (10) for the pads and a suspension element (40) for hanging the bag where required. The suspension device is fixed so that it cannot move relative to the bag, at least in the region of one fixing surface (18) of the bag. The suspension element may be glued, or welded to the fixing surface and may be sealed to the sealing surface.

Abstract (de)

Bei einer Vorrichtung zum Bereitstellen von Hygieneartikeln, insbesondere Wattepads (30), mit einem zum Aufnehmen der Hygieneartikel dienenden Beutel (10) und einem dem Beutel zugeordneten Aufhängeelement (40) zum Aufhängen des Beutels an einem Bereitstellungsort wird vorgeschlagen das Aufhängeelement zumindest im Bereich einer Befestigungsfläche des Beutels unbewegbar bezüglich dem Beutel zu befestigen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 75/56; B65B 9/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 9/073 (2012.01); B65D 75/56 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 9/073 (2013.01); B65B 35/40 (2013.01); B65D 75/56 (2013.01); B65D 2575/565 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1000872 A1 20000517; DE 19852297 A1 20000518

INPADOC legal status


2002-07-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020108

2001-10-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010827

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000710

2000-08-09 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: RAUSCHER & CO., VERBANDSTOFF- UND WATTEFABRIKEN GE

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI