Global Patent Index - EP 1000874 A2

EP 1000874 A2 2000-05-17 - Pressurized container

Title (en)

Pressurized container

Title (de)

Druckbehälter

Title (fr)

Récipient sous pression

Publication

EP 1000874 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99810948 A

Priority

DE 19851890 A

Abstract (en)

The pressure vessel has two chambers (e.g. 1) sealed from each other for the storage of different fluid or viscous products. It issuing device (11) has a common valve plate (3) fixed to an insert (2). The valve plate is made of a non-adhesive plastic such as a polyolefin, possibly halogenized, , with an issuing valve (8, 9) for each chamber. An O-ring (4), loaded by a clamping ring (5), provides the seal between the valve plate and the insert.

Abstract (de)

Ein Druckbehälter mit mindestens zwei gegeneinander abgedichteten Kammern (1, 10) zur Aufnahme von verschiedenen, flüssigen oder halbflüssigen Komponenten (K1, K2), ist mit einer Abgabeeinrichtung (11) versehen, welche eine für die Kammern (1, 10) gemeinsame, an einem Einsatz (2) fixierte Ventilplatte (3) aufweist. Die Ventilplatte (3) besteht aus einem nicht adhäsiven Kunststoff, vorzugsweise aus einem Polyolefin oder einem halogenierten Polyolefin. In diese Ventilplatte (3) ist für jede Kammer (1, 10) je ein mit ihrem Innern in Verbindung stehendes Abgabeventil (8, 9) eingesetzt. Zur Abdichtung zwischen der Ventilplatte (3) und dem Einsatz (2) ist ein durch einen Spannring (5) belasteter O-Ring (4) vorgesehen. Der Spannring (5) wird zusammen mit dem O-Ring (4) durch eine plastische Materialverformung des Einsatzes (2) in der vorgespannten Position gehalten. Die Dichtflächen der Abgabeventile (8, 9) sind mit einem elastischen Material beschichtet. Schliesslich weist die Ventilplatte (3) auf ihrer Unterseite einen im wesentlichen hohlzylindrisch ausgebildeten Fortsatz (17) auf, an dem ein die eine Kammer (10) bildender Behälter befestigt ist. Der Fortsatz (17) ist auf der Aussenseite mit einem erhöhten, zylindrisch verlaufenden Abschnitt versehen ist, der eine ringförmig verlaufende Nut aufweist, in der ein weiterer O-Ring aufgenommen ist, der den Behälter (10) am Halsabschnitt sicher abdichtet. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 83/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 83/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 83/38 (2013.01); B65D 83/682 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0111089 A2 19840620 - LADOCO AG [CH]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1000874 A2 20000517; EP 1000874 A3 20000816; EP 1000874 B1 20051207; AT 312028 T 20051215; DE 19851890 A1 20000531; DE 19851890 B4 20050210; DE 59912892 D1 20060112

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170313

- Year of fee payment: 18

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051207

2008-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061020

2008-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070126

2007-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-01-26 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2006-11-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060908

2006-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-07-05 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20051207

2006-01-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59912892 P 20060112

2005-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-12-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

2005-12-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-12-07 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051207

2005-08-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DR. ING. ROLAND LECHNER

2004-11-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041004

2001-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR GB LI

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001005

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI