Global patent index - EP 1000892 A1

EP 1000892 A1 2000-05-17 - Method of running a roll winding device and roll winding device

Title (en)

Method of running a roll winding device and roll winding device

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Betreiben einer Rollenwickeleinrichtung und Rollenwickeleinrichtung

Title (fr)

Méthode pour le fonctionnement d'un dispositif d'enroulement et dispositif d'enroulement

Publication

EP 1000892 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99121435 A

Priority

DE 19851483 A

Abstract (en)

The reel winding device has at least two drives (3,5) which apply different drive forces to a material reel. The drive forces are determined directly at the point of introduction, and a force difference is formed. The drive forces may be determined outside the winding process. The drive forces may be the peripheral forces. The winding roller that first comes in contact with the material web (8) may be braked. An Independent claim is also included for a reel winding device.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Rollenwickeleinrichtung mit mindestens zwei auf eine Rolle (7) wirkenden Antrieben (2, 4) angeben und Verfahren zum Betreiben der Rollenwickeleinrichtung. Beim Wickeln mit einer derartigen Rollenwickeleinrichtung möchte man eine gewisse Spannung in der Materialbahn (8) erzeugen und diese in die Rolle einwickeln, um den Wickelhärteverlauf zu beeinflussen. Hierzu ist eine Meßeinrichtung (9) vorgesehen, die mit den Antrieben (2, 4) zusammenwirkt und die Antriebskraft am Ort der Einleitung ermittelt. Die Meßeinrichtung (9) weist für jede der beiden Wicklerwalzen (2, 4) einen Kraftaufnehmer auf, wobei die Kraftaufnehmer mit einer Auswerteeinrichtung (18) verbunden sind. Es ist damit möglich, die Antriebskräfte unmittelbar an der Wickelrolle zu ermitteln und daraus eine Kraftdifferenz zu bilden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 18/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 18/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 18/20 (2013.01); B65H 2515/32 (2013.01); B65H 2551/21 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

B65H 2515/32 + B65H 2220/03

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1000892 A1 20000517; EP 1000892 B1 20070314; DE 19851483 A1 20000518; DE 19851483 C2 20020131; DE 59914251 D1 20070426; US 6325321 B1 20011204

INPADOC legal status

2009-08-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090501

2009-07-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081028

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070314

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071102

2008-02-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071015

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-02-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20071217

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20071025

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070314

2007-11-09 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2007-11-02 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2007-10-10 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20070314

2007-04-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59914251

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2007-04-26

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2007-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB

2007-03-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-09-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-04-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020304

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FI FR GB

2000-12-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000329

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI