Global patent index - EP 1000893 A1

EP 1000893 A1 2000-05-17 - Winding machine for winding a web of material

Title (en)

Winding machine for winding a web of material

Title (de)

Wickelmaschine zum Aufwickeln einer Materialbahn

Title (fr)

Enrouleuse pour enrouler une bande de matériau

Publication

EP 1000893 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99114490 A

Priority

DE 19852257 A

Abstract (en)

A winding machine (10) rolls up a web (12) of paper or carton onto a drum (14, 14'). The web (12) passes over a supporting drum (18). The drums (14, 14'; 18) are separated by a gap (22). The angle of the drums may be adjusted with respect to the direction (L) of the oncoming web (12) by jacks (42, 56). An Independent claim is included for a winding machine.

Abstract (de)

Eine Wickelmaschine zum Aufwickeln einer Materialbahn, insbesondere einer Papier- oder Kartonbahn (12) auf einen Wickelkern, z.B. Tambour (14), so daß sich auf dem Wickelkern eine Wickelrolle (20) bildet, ist erfindungsgemäß durch folgende Merkmale gekennzeichnet: an wenigstens einem der zwei Lager (52) der Anpreßwalze (18) ist eine Positions-Meßeinrichtung (53) vorgesehen, die einen (von der momentanen Position der Anpreßwalze abhängenden) Positions-Istwert erzeugt; es ist ein Regler (55) vorgesehen, der den Positions-Istwert mit einem Positions-Sollwert vergleicht, wobei der Regler eine Steuergröße abgibt, die der Abweichung des Istwertes vom Sollwert entspricht; eine Leitung (57) für die Stellgröße verbindet den Regler (55) mit dem Steuergerät (45) der Hubeinrichtungen. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 19/22; B65H 18/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 18/10 (2006.01); B65H 23/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 18/10 (2013.01); B65H 23/02 (2013.01); B65H 23/0328 (2013.01); B65H 2301/414322 (2013.01); B65H 2301/41466 (2013.01); B65H 2408/236 (2013.01); B65H 2515/50 (2013.01); B65H 2601/125 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6402082 B1 20020611; AT 259748 T 20040315; DE 19852257 A1 20000518; EP 1000893 A1 20000517; EP 1000893 B1 20040218

INPADOC legal status

2015-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140723

2014-05-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130723

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-04-30 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59908571

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-03-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 259748

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20130723

2013-10-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130711

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-03-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120711

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120720

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-07-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080724

2009-03-17 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070712

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-02-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041119

2004-06-01 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2004-03-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59908571

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-03-25

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2002-08-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020712

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE FI SE

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001117

2000-12-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI