Global patent index - EP 1000899 A1

EP 1000899 A1 2000-05-17 - Method of measuring the quantity of petrol delivered by the hose of a petrol pump

Title (en)

Method of measuring the quantity of petrol delivered by the hose of a petrol pump

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Ermittlung der durch den Zapfschlauch einer Zapfstelle abgegebenen Menge eines Kraftstoffes

Title (fr)

Procédé de mesure de débit d'un carburant délivré par le tuyau d'un poste d'essence

Publication

EP 1000899 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98120597 A

Priority

EP 98120597 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves detecting a first measurement value after an interruption of the measurement process and comparing it with a predefined, programmable number of measurement values. The measurement value is not taken into account for determining and displaying the price if it does not exceed the predefined, programmable number of measurement values, but otherwise is taken into account.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zur Ermittlung der durch den Zapfschlauch (3) einer Zapfstelle (1) abgegebenen Menge eines Kraftstoffes, insbesondere eines bleifreien flüssigen Kraftstoffes zum Betrieb von Verbrennungsmotoren, wobei der Kraftstoff mittels einer Pumpe (8) aus einem Vorratsbehälter gefördert und über ein der Pumpe (8) im Kraftstofffluß nachgeschaltetes Meßwerk (11) dem mit einem Zapfventil (5) versehenen Zapfschlauch (3) zugeführt wird und nach dem Start des Zapfvorganges durch das Meßwerk (11) Meßwerte zur Messung der abgegebenen Kraftstoffmenge erzeugt werden, die mittels eines Rechners zur Ermittlung und Anzeige sowohl der abgegebenen Menge als auch des sich hieraus ergebenden Preises herangezogen werden. Um ein Verfahren der beschriebenen Art zum Messen der durch den Zapfschlauch einer Zapfstelle abgegebenen Menge eines Kraftstoffes zu schaffen, das eine Kompensation derartiger Differenzen ohne konstruktive Änderung der vorhandenen Zapfstellenkonstruktion auf einfache Weise ermöglicht, wird vorgeschlagen, daß nach einer Unterbrechung des Meßvorgangs innerhalb eines Zapfvorganges die ersten vom Meßwerk erzeugten Meßwerte erfaßt und mit einer vorgegebenen Anzahl von Meßwerten verglichen werden, und die erfaßten Meßwerte nicht bei der Ermittlung und Anzeige von Menge und Preis berücksichtigt werden, wenn die vorgegebene Anzahl von Meßwerten nicht überschritten wird, jedoch die erfaßten Meßwerte in die Ermittlung und Anzeige von Menge und Preis unmittelbar einbezogen werden, wenn die vorgegebene Anzahl von Meßwerten überschritten wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B67D 5/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B67D 7/22 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B67D 7/222 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1000899 A1 20000517; EP 1000899 B1 20030827; AT 248126 T 20030915; DE 59809431 D1 20031002; ES 2205361 T3 20040501

INPADOC legal status

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151218

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141031

2016-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151022

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151021

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151023

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151021

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20151127

2015-10-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20131029

- Year of fee payment: 16

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: SCHEIDT & BACHMANN GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2004-08-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040528

2004-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2205361

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-04-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-10-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59809431

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-10-02

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-09-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2003-08-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-08-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR LI NL

2002-09-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020806

2001-01-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE ES FR LI NL

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990619

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR LI NL

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI