Global Patent Index - EP 1000917 A1

EP 1000917 A1 2000-05-17 - Gas producing composition

Title (en)

Gas producing composition

Title (de)

Gaserzeugende Zusammensetzung

Title (fr)

Composition génératrice de gaz

Publication

EP 1000917 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99122585 A

Priority

JP 32371898 A

Abstract (en)

There is provided ammonium nitrate (NH4NO3), metal nitride, and, as the need arise, inorganic oxidizing agent or metal powder. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C06D 5/06; C06B 31/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01J 7/00 (2006.01); B60R 21/26 (2011.01); B60R 21/264 (2006.01); C06B 31/28 (2006.01); C06D 5/00 (2006.01); C06D 5/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C06D 5/06 (2013.01); C06B 31/28 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1000917 A1 20000517; JP 2000154087 A 20000606

INPADOC legal status


2002-10-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020305

2001-12-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011023

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001116

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI