Global Patent Index - EP 1001039 A1

EP 1001039 A1 2000-05-17 - Rotating chute for distributing loose material with adjustable angle

Title (en)

Rotating chute for distributing loose material with adjustable angle

Title (de)

Drehbare Verteilerschurre für Stückgut mit einstellbarem Neigungswinkel

Title (fr)

Dispositif de repartition de matières en vrac avec goulotte tournante à angle d'inclinaison variable

Publication

EP 1001039 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99115274 A

Priority

LU 90319 A

Abstract (en)

First (20) of two rotors (20, 30) has two bearing blocks in which distribution chute (42) is suspended, pivotable around a horizontal axis. Gear transmission (52) on first rotor comprises input and output shafts. Each of two pivoting levers at the level of the two bearing blocks is symmetrically connected to one of two transmission cranks by gear transmission through a link. The unit comprises: (a) a chute (42); (b) a first rotor (20) with a vertical axis of rotation carrying two suspension blocks, the chute being suspended in the two suspension blocks such that it can pivot around a pivoting axis that is more or less horizontal; (c) a second rotor (30) with axis of rotation coaxial with that of the first rotor (20), the second rotor (30) being equipped with an annular gear (58); and (d) a gear transmission (52) carried by the first rotor (20) and comprising an input shaft (54) equipped with a pinion (56) which engages with the annular gear (58) of the second rotor (30), and an output shaft which is parallel to the pivoting axis of the chute (42) and with which is associated a rod-crank system producing pivoting of the chute (42) when the input shaft (54) is driven by the annular gear (58) of the second rotor.

Abstract (fr)

Un dispositif de répartition de matières en vrac comprend un premier rotor (20) et un deuxième rotor (30). Le premier rotor (20) porte deux paliers de suspension (44, 46), dans lesquels une goulotte (42) de distribution est suspendue de façon à pouvoir pivoter autour d'un axe de pivotement sensiblement horizontal. Une transmission par engrenages (52), portée par le premier rotor (20), comprend un arbre d'entrée (54) et un arbre de sortie (60). L'arbre d'entrée est muni d'un pignon (56) qui s'engrène avec une couronne dentée (58) du deuxième rotor (30). L'arbre de sortie de la transmission est parallèle à l'axe de pivotement de la goulotte (42) et comprend deux manivelles (64, 66). La goulotte (42) est munie d'un levier de pivotement (48, 50) au niveau de chacun de ses deux paliers de suspension (44, 46). Chacun de ces deux leviers de pivotement (48, 50) est symétriquement connecté à une des deux manivelles (64, 66) de la transmission par engrenages (52) par l'intermédiaire d'une bielle (68, 70). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21B 7/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F27B 1/20 (2006.01); C21B 7/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21B 7/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1001039 A1 20000517; EP 1001039 B1 20060322; AT 321150 T 20060415; BR 9907323 A 20000815; CN 1132943 C 20031231; CN 1253903 A 20000524; DE 69930448 D1 20060511; DE 69930448 T2 20061019; LU 90319 A1 20000718; RU 2208207 C2 20030710; TW 389818 B 20000511; US 6213275 B1 20010410

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160518

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160517

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160517

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160518

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120731

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120731

2013-04-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130329

2011-12-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110726

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-07-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110624

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061227

2007-03-09 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1028069

2006-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69930448 P 20060511

2006-05-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20060412

2006-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT NL

2006-03-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-02-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041223

2005-01-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000724

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FR GB IT NL

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT NL

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI