Global Patent Index - EP 1001040 A1

EP 1001040 A1 2000-05-17 - Process for surface hardening of workpieces from casting materials, workpieces produced thereby and their use

Title (en)

Process for surface hardening of workpieces from casting materials, workpieces produced thereby and their use

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Oberflächenhärtung von Formkörpern aus Gusswerkstoff sowie dadurch hergestellte Formkörper und deren Verwendung

Title (fr)

Procede destiné a durcir la surface de pièces en matériaux de moulage, les pièces produites ainsi et leur utilisation

Publication

EP 1001040 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99122515 A

Priority

DE 19852450 A

Abstract (en)

Process for surface hardening a molded body made of metastable iron-carbon cast material comprises: (a) heating the molded body in a decarburizing atmosphere, (b) cooling the molded body and (c) heating the body in a nitrogen-releasing medium.

Abstract (de)

Verfahren zur Oberflächenhärtung eines Formkörpers aus metastabil erstarrtem Eisen-Kohlenstoff-Gußwerkstoff, wobei das Verfahren wenigsten die Schritte umfaßt: ein Erhitzen des Formkörpers in einer entkohlenden Atmosphäre, ein Abkühlen des Formkörpers, gegebenenfalls ein Anlassen des Formkörpers und ein Erhitzen des Formkörpers in einem stickstoffabgebenden Medium. Des weiteren betrifft die Erfindung den über das Verfahren hergestellten Formkörper sowie dessen Verwendung. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C21D 5/04; C23C 8/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21D 3/04 (2006.01); C21D 5/04 (2006.01); C23C 8/02 (2006.01); C23C 8/26 (2006.01); C21D 1/78 (2006.01); C21D 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21D 5/04 (2013.01); C21D 3/04 (2013.01); C23C 8/02 (2013.01); C23C 8/26 (2013.01); C21D 1/78 (2013.01); C21D 5/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1001040 A1 20000517; DE 19852450 A1 20000525; DE 19852450 C2 20000824

INPADOC legal status


2003-04-23 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20021201

2002-07-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020528

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT

2000-08-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000605

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI