Global Patent Index - EP 1001053 A1

EP 1001053 A1 2000-05-17 - Method for manufacturing hot dip tinned wires

Title (en)

Method for manufacturing hot dip tinned wires

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung feuerverzinnter Drähte

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la fabrication des fils étamés à chaud

Publication

EP 1001053 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99122362 A

Priority

DE 19852271 A

Abstract (en)

Production of tin-coated wires made of non-ferrous metals comprises nickel plating a pre-treated wire with a layer of 0.5-5 microns thickness and then tin-coating to form a 0.5-10, preferably 1-5 microns thick layer.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf ein Verfahren zur Herstellung verzinnter Drähte aus NE-Metallen, insbesondere Kupfer oder Kupferlegierungen für elektotechnische Zwecke, bei dem der Draht in einer ersten Stufe galvanisch mit einer Schichtdicke von 0,5 bis 5 µm vernickelt und in einer zweiten Stufe mit einer Schichtdicke von 0,5 bis 10 µm, vorzugsweise 1 bis 5 µm, feuerverzinnt wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C23C 28/02; C23C 2/08; C23C 2/10; C23C 2/38; C25D 3/12; C25D 3/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C23C 2/02 (2006.01); C23C 28/02 (2006.01); C25D 7/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C23C 2/02 (2013.01); C23C 28/023 (2013.01); C25D 7/0607 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] US 3875027 A 19750401 - GONDEK STANLEY F
  • [A] US 4014660 A 19770329 - SCHREINER HORST, et al
  • [A] DE 29614464 U1 19961128 - EDELHOFF ADOLF FEINDRAHTWERK [DE]
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 017, no. 361 (C - 1080) 8 July 1993 (1993-07-08)
  • [A] DATABASE WPI Week 7734, Derwent World Patents Index; AN 1977-59871y, XP002129814, "Activation of nickel plated surfaces - using a mineral acid and an aliphatic halide"

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1001053 A1 20000517; DE 19852271 A1 20000518

INPADOC legal status


2001-09-13 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-08-08 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20001118

2001-01-31 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000405

2000-05-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SONNEFELD, MANFRED

2000-05-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LIEDERMANN, JOERG

2000-05-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SALLMON, GEORG

2000-05-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI